Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 16-13
No. 16-13
Title:
Carmon Elliott, Petitioner
v.
Ted Cruz
Docketed:June 30, 2016
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
  Case Nos.:(29 MAP 2016)
  Decision Date:March 31, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 28 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 1, 2016)
Jul 14 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Ted Cruz to respond filed.
Jul 27 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Oct 3 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Mario Apuzzo 185 Gatzmer Avenue (732)-521-1900
    Counsel of RecordJamesburg, NJ  08831
apuzzo@erols.com
Party name: Carmon Elliott
Attorneys for Respondent:
Robert N. Feltoon Conard O'Brien PC(215) 864-8064
    Counsel of Record 1500 Market Street, West Tower
Suite 3900
Philadelphia, PA  19102
rfeltoon@conradobrien.com
Party name: Ted Cruz
February 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2