Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-1277
No. 16-1277
Title:
McGarry & McGarry LLC, Petitioner
v.
Rabobank, N.A.
Docketed:April 25, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(16-3164)
  Decision Date:January 26, 2017

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 21 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 25, 2017)
Apr 28 2017 Waiver of right of respondent Rabobank, N.A. to respond filed.
May 2 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 22 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
William Dunnegan 350 Fifth Avenue(212) 332-8300
    Counsel of RecordSuite 4908
New York, NY  10118
wd@dunnegan.com
Party name: McGarry & McGarry LLC
Attorneys for Respondent:
Allison A. Davis Davis Wrigh Tremaine, LLP(415)-276-6580
    Counsel of Record 505 Montgomery Street, Suite 800
San Francisco, CA  94111
allisondavis@dwt.com
Party name: Rabobank, N.A.
May 27, 2017 | Version 2014.2