Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-1149
No. 16-1149
Title:
Paul M. Daugerdas, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 22, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-2437-cr)
  Decision Date:September 21, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:December 20, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 20 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 21, 2017)
Mar 31 2017 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Apr 5 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 17 2017 Response Requested . (Due May 17, 2017)
May 16 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 16, 2017.
Jun 15 2017 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 23, 2017.
Jun 23 2017 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jul 12 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Brian D. Linder Clayman & Rosenberg LLP(212) 922-1080
    Counsel of Record305 Madison Avenue
Suite 1301
New York, NY  10165
linder@clayro.com
Party name: Paul M. Daugerdas
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
July 22, 2017 | Version 2014.2