Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-1148
No. 16-1148
Title:
Evergreen Partnering Group, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Pactiv Corporation, et al.
Docketed:March 22, 2017
Linked with 16A658
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-1839)
  Decision Date:August 2, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:October 18, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 28 2016 Application (16A658) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 16, 2017 to March 17, 2017, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Jan 5 2017 Application (16A658) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until March 17, 2017.
Mar 17 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 21, 2017)
Mar 30 2017 Waiver of right of respondent Pactiv Corporation to respond filed.
Mar 30 2017 Waiver of right of respondent American Chemistry Council, Incorporated, an association to respond filed.
Mar 31 2017 Waiver of right of respondents Dart Container Corp. and Solo Cup, Co. to respond filed.
Mar 31 2017 Waiver of right of respondent Dolco Packaging, a Tekni-Plex Company to respond filed.
Apr 21 2017 Brief amici curiae of Law Professors and Antitrust/Industrial Organization Scholars filed.
May 9 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 16 2017 Response Requested . (Due June 15, 2017)



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Richard Wolfram 750 Third Avenue(917) 225-3050
9th Floor
New York, NY  10012
rwolfram@rwolframlex.com
Party name: Evergreen Partnering Group, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Steven M. Cowley Duane Morris, LLP(857) 488-4261
    Counsel of Record100 High Street
Boston, MA  02110
smcowley@duanemorris.com
Party name: Dolco Packaging, a Tekni-Plex Company
 
William E. Lawler Vinson & Elkins, LLP(202) 639-6679
    Counsel of Record2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Suite #500, West
Washington, DC  20037-1701
wlawler@velaw.com
Party name: Dart Container Corp. and Solo Cup, Co.
 
Ralph T. Lepore Holland & Knight LLP(617)-523-2700
    Counsel of Record10 St. James Avenue
Boston, MA  02116
Party name: American Chemistry Council, Incorporated, an association
 
Richard A. Sawin Jr. Michienzie & Sawin, LLC(617) 227-5660
    Counsel of Record745 Boylston Street
Suite #501
Boston, MA  02116
rsawin@masatlaw.com
Party name: Pactiv Corporation
Other:
Peter D. St. Phillip Jr. Lowey, Dannenberg, Cohen & Hart, PC.(914) 997-0500
One N. Broadway, 5th Floor
White Plains, NY  10601
pstphillip@lowey.com
Party name: Law Professors and Antitrust/Industrial Organization Scholars
May 27, 2017 | Version 2014.2