Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-1144
No. 16-1144
Title:
Carl J. Marinello, II, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 22, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-2224)
  Decision Date:October 14, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:February 15, 2017
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 21 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 21, 2017)
Apr 12 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 22, 2017.
Apr 21 2017 Brief amicus curiae of The American College of Tax Counsel filed.
Apr 21 2017 Brief amici curiae of Cause of Action Institute, at el. filed.
May 22 2017 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
May 25 2017 Letter of May 25, 2017, with supplemental authority from the Acting Solicitor General received.
Jun 5 2017 Reply of petitioner Carl J. Marinello, II filed.
Jun 6 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 26, 2017.
Jun 27 2017 Petition GRANTED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Matthew S. Hellman Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6861
    Counsel of Record1099 New York Ave., N.W, Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
mhellman@jenner.com
Party name: Carl J. Marinello, II
 
Joseph M. LaTona 403 Main Street(716) 842-0416
716 Brisbane Building
Buffalo, NY  14203
sandyw@tomburton.com
Party name: Carl J. Marinello, II
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
Jenny L. Johnson Johnson & Moore, LLC(312) 549-9990
150 North Wacker Dr.
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL  60606
jenny.johnson@jmtaxlitigation.com
Party name: The American College of Tax Counsel
 
John J. Vecchione Cause of Action Institute(202) 499-4232
1875 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
john.vecchione@causeofaction.org
Party name: Cause of Action Institute, at el.
July 20, 2017 | Version 2014.2