Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-1102
No. 16-1102
Title:
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., et al., Petitioners
v.
Apple Inc.
Docketed:March 10, 2017
Linked with 16A823
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-1171, 15-1195, 15-1994)
  Decision Date:October 7, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:November 28, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 17 2017 Application (16A823) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 26, 2017 to March 29, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Feb 21 2017 Application (16A823) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 29, 2017.
Mar 10 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2017)
Mar 30 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 22, 2017.
Apr 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Public Knowledge, et al. filed.
Apr 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of The Hispanic Leadership Fund, et al. filed.
Apr 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of The Software & Information Industry Association, et al. filed.
Apr 10 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Professors filed.
May 22 2017 Brief of respondent Apple Inc. in opposition filed.
Jun 5 2017 Reply of petitioners Samsung Electronics Co., et al. filed.
Jun 6 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017 The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Kathleen M. Sullivan Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP(212) 849-7000
    Counsel of Record51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY  10010
kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
Party name: Samsung Electronics Co., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent:
William F. Lee Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP(617) 526-6000
    Counsel of Record60 State Street
Boston, MA  02109
william.lee@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Apple Inc.
Other:
Joseph Carl Cecere Cecere PC(469) 600-9455
6035 McComass Blvd.
Dallas, TX  75206
ccecere@cecerepc.com
Party name: The Hispanic Leadership Fund, et al.
 
Bernard H. Chao University of Denver Sturm College of Law 303-871-6110
2255 E. Evans Avenue
Denver, CO  80208
bchao@law.du.edu
Party name: Intellectual Property Professors
 
Charles Duan Public Knowledge(202) 861-0020
1818 N Street, NW, Suite 410
Washington, DC  20036
cduan@publicknowledge.org
Party name: Public Knowledge, et al.
 
John F. Duffy Hughes, Hubbard & Reed(202) 721-4600
1775 I Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006
john.duffy@hugheshubbard.com
Party name: The Software & Information Industry Association, et al.
July 13, 2017 | Version 2014.2