Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1077
No. 16-1077
Title:
Bay Point Properties, Inc., fka BP Properties, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Mississippi Transportation Commission, et al.
Docketed:March 7, 2017
Linked with 16A552
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Mississippi
  Case Nos.:(2014-CA-01684-SCT)
  Decision Date:July 21, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:November 3, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 2 2016 Application (16A552) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 1, 2017 to March 3, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Dec 7 2016 Application (16A552) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 3, 2017.
Mar 3 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 6, 2017)
Mar 30 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 8, 2017.
Apr 6 2017 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation.
Apr 6 2017 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Virginia Institute for Public Policy, et al.
Apr 6 2017 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Cato Institute, et al.
May 8 2017 Brief of respondents Mississippi Transportation Commission, et al. in opposition filed.
May 15 2017 Reply of petitioner Bay Point Properties, Inc., fka BP Properties, Inc. filed.
May 23 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017.
Jun 6 2017 Rescheduled.
Jun 12 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017.
Jun 19 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Cato Institute, et al. GRANTED.
Jun 26 2017 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation GRANTED.
Jun 26 2017 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Virginia Institute for Public Policy, et al. GRANTED.
Jun 26 2017 Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Gorsuch, with whom Justice Thomas joins, respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion).



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Robert H. Thomas Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert(808) 531-8031
    Counsel of Record1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI  96813
rht@hawaiilawyer.com
Party name: Bay Point Properties, Inc., fka BP Properties, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Christopher M. Howdeshell Pittman Law Firm601-264- 3314
    Counsel of RecordP.O. Drawer 17138
140 Mayfair Road, Suite 700
Hattiesburg, MS  39404-7138
chris@pittmanlawfirm.net
Party name: Mississippi Transportation Commission, et al.
Other:
Michael M. Berger Manatt, Phelps & Phillips LLP(310) 312-4000
11355 West Olympic Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA  90064
mmberger@manatt.com
Party name: Virginia Institute for Public Policy and Owners Counsel of America
 
Mark F. Hearne II. Arent Fox LLP(202) 857-6000
1717 K St., NW
Washington, DC  20036
thor@arentfox.com
Party name: The Cato Institute, et al.
 
Brian T. Hodges Pacific Legal Foundation(425) 576-0484
10940 NE 33rd Place
Suite 210
Bellevue, WA  98004
bth@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543