Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1066
No. 16-1066
Title:
Steven S. Michel, Petitioner
v.
Addison Mitchell McConnell, Jr., United States Senator, et al.
Docketed:March 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(16-5340)
  Decision Date:December 7, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 2 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2017)
Mar 13 2017 Waiver of right of respondents Addison Mitchell McConnell, Jr., United States Senator, et al. to respond filed.
Mar 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017 Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Steven Michel 2025 Senda de Andres(505) 690-8733
Santa Fe, NM  87501
stevenmichel@comcast.net
Party name: Steven S. Michel
Attorneys for Respondents:
Patricia Mack Bryan Office of Senate Legal Counsel(202) 224-4435
    Counsel of Record642 Hart Senate Office Bldg.
Washington, DC  20510
pat_bryan@legal.senate.gov
Party name: Addison Mitchell McConnell, Jr., United States Senator, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543