Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1024
No. 16-1024
Title:
Viktor Bout, aka Victor Anatoliyevich Bout, aka Viktor Bulakin, aka Viktor Butt, aka Vadim Markovich Aminov, aka Viktor Budd, aka Viktor But, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 23, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-3592)
  Decision Date:November 21, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 21 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 27, 2017)
Mar 7 2017 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Mar 15 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017.
Mar 23 2017 Brief amicus curiae of The Russian Federation filed. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Alexey V. Tarasov 5211 Reading Road(832) 623-6250
    Counsel of RecordRosenberg, TX  77471
Party name: Viktor Bout, aka Victor Anatoliyevich Bout, aka Viktor Bulakin, aka Viktor Butt, aka Vadim Markovich Aminov, aka Viktor Budd, aka Viktor But
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
Michael J. Sullivan Ashcroft Law Firm, LLC(617) 573-9400
200 State Street, 7th Floor
Boston, MA  02109
MSullivan@Ashcroftlawfirm.com
Party name: The Russian Federation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543