Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15A886
No. 15A886
Title:
Michigan, et al., Applicants
v.
Environmental Protection Agency
Docketed:February 24, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-1100)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 23 2016 Application (15A886) for a stay or injunction pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Feb 24 2016 Response to application (15A886) requested by The Chief Justice, due Wednesday, March 2, 2016, by 4 p.m.
Mar 2 2016 Response to application from respondent Environmental Protection Agency filed.
Mar 2 2016 Response to application from respondents Massachusetts, et al. filed.
Mar 2 2016 Response to application from respondents Calpine Corporation, et al. filed.
Mar 3 2016 Application (15A886) denied by The Chief Justice.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Aaron D. Lindstrom Solicitor General(517) 373-1124
    Counsel of Record Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI  48909
Party name: Michigan, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Brendan K. Collins Ballard Spahr LLP(215) 665-8500
1735 Market Street, 51st Floor
Philadelphia, PA  19103-7599
Party name: Calpine Corporation, et al.
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: Environmental Protection Agency
 
Melissa Ann Hoffer Assistant Attorney General617-963-2322
    Counsel of Record Environmental Protection Division
One Ashburton Place, 18th Floor
Boston, MA  02108
Party name: Massachusetts, et al.
September 26, 2016 | Version 2014.2