Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15A872
No. 15A872
Title:
MCM Portfolio LLC, Applicant
v.
Hewlett-Packard Company
Docketed:February 19, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-1091)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 18 2016 Application (15A872) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 1, 2016 to March 31, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy (The Chief Justice is recused).
Feb 24 2016 Application (15A872) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until March 31, 2016.
Mar 16 2016 Application (15A872) to extend further the time from March 31, 2016 to April 29, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy (The Chief Justice is recused).
Mar 21 2016 Application (15A872) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until April 29, 2016.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Thomas C. Goldstein Goldstein & Russell, P.C.(202) 362-0636
    Counsel of Record7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD  20814
Party name: MCM Portfolio LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543