Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15A792
No. 15A792
Title:
Securities and Exchange Commission, Applicant
v.
National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
Docketed:January 29, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-5252)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 29 2016 Application (15A792) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 7, 2016 to March 9, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Feb 1 2016 Application (15A792) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 9, 2016.
Feb 22 2016 Application (15A792) to extend further the time from March 9, 2016 to April 7, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Feb 22 2016 Application (15A792) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 7, 2016.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission
August 30, 2016 | Version 2014.2