Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15A643
No. 15A643
Title:
Albert D. Bell, Applicant
v.
Arkansas
Docketed:December 17, 2015
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arkansas
  Case Nos.:(CR-15-367)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 15 2015 Application (15A643) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 6, 2015 to March 7, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito.
Dec 17 2015 Application (15A643) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 5, 2016.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Michael J. Teter University of Utah(801) 585-1863
    Counsel of RecordS.J. Quinney College of Law
380 S. University Street
Salt Lake City, UT  84112
Party name: Albert D. Bell

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543