Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-997
No. 15-997
Title:
Laurie A. Bebo, Petitioner
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:February 4, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-1511)
  Decision Date:August 24, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:November 5, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 3 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 7, 2016)
Mar 7 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission to respond filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Mark Cuban filed. (Distrubuted)
Mar 9 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 25, 2016.
Mar 17 2016 Supplemental brief of petitioner Laurie A. Bebo filed. (Distributed)
Mar 28 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Kate E. Maternowski Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren S.C.(414) 298-1000
    Counsel of Record1000 North Water Street
Suite 1700
Milwaukee, WI  53202
kmaternowski@reinhartlaw.com
Party name: Laurie A. Bebo
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission
Other:
Stephen Andrew Best Brown Rudnick, LLP(202) 536-1700
601 Thirteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC  20005
sbest@brownrudnick.com
Party name: Mark Cuban

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543