Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 15-983
No. 15-983
Title:
David A. Bardes, Petitioner
v.
L. Patrick Auld, Magistrate Judge, United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina, et al.
Docketed:February 2, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-2396)
  Decision Date:January 19, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 26 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 3, 2016)
Feb 17 2016 Waiver of right of respondents L. Patrick Auld, Magistrate Judge, United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina, et al. to respond filed.
Mar 23 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016.
Apr 18 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
David A. Bardes 213 Rainbow Lake Drive(828) 393-4599
Brevard, NC  28712
davidbardes@davidbardes.com
Party name: David A. Bardes
Attorneys for Respondents:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: L. Patrick Auld, Magistrate Judge, United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina, et al.
April 30, 2017 | Version 2014.2