Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-969
No. 15-969
Title:
Florida Bankers Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of the Treasury, et al.
Docketed:January 29, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-5036)
  Decision Date:August 14, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:November 5, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 29 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 29, 2016)
Feb 25 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 30, 2016.
Feb 26 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Cause of Action Institute filed.
Feb 26 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Legal Center, et al. filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Professor Kristin E. Hickman filed.
Mar 24 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 13, 2016.
Apr 14 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 27, 2016.
Apr 27 2016 Brief of respondents Department of the Treasury, et al. in opposition filed.
May 17 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 2, 2016.
Jun 6 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
James J. Butera Jones Walker LLP(202) 203-1000
499 South Capitol Street SW
Suite 600
Washington, DC  20003
Party name: Florida Bankers Association, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Department of the Treasury, et al.
Other:
George M. Clarke Baker & Mackenzie, LLP(202) 452-7000
815 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20006
george.clarke@bakermckenzie.com
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Legal Center, et al.
 
Kristin E. Hickman University of Minnesota Law School(612)-624-2915
229 -19th Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN  55455
khickman@umn.edu
Party name: Professor Kristin E. Hickman
 
Alfred J. Lechner Jr. Cause of Action Institute(202) 499-4232
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., Suite 650
Washington, MD  20006
jlechner@causeofaction.org
Party name: Cause of Action Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543