Docket for 15-9565
No. 15-9565 | |
Title: |
Joshua R. Nisbet, Petitioner |
v. |
Maine |
|
Docketed: | June 1, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Judicial Court of Maine |
Case Nos.: | (Cum-14-224) |
Decision Date: | March 1, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 28 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 1, 2016) |
Jul 14 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|