Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-9190
No. 15-9190     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Phillip Hancock, Petitioner
v.
Kevin Duckworth, Interim Warden
Docketed:May 4, 2016
Linked with 15A868
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-6255)
  Decision Date:August 18, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:December 4, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 16 2016 Application (15A868) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 3, 2016 to May 2, 2016, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Feb 23 2016 Application (15A868) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 2, 2016.
May 2 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 3, 2016)
May 26 2016 Brief of respondent Kevin Duckworth, Interim Warden in opposition filed.
Jun 7 2016 Reply of petitioner Phillip Hancock filed.
Jun 16 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Oct 3 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Madeline S. Cohen 1942 Broadway (303) 402-6933
Suite 314
Boulder, CO  80302
madeline@madelinecohenlaw.com
Party name: Phillip Hancock
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jennifer L. Crabb Office of the Attorney General(405)-521-3921
    Counsel of Record313 N.E. 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK  73105
jennifer.crabb@oag.ok.gov
Party name: Kevin Duckworth, Interim Warden

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543