Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-9057
No. 15-9057
Title:
Scott Lee DeShaw, Petitioner
v.
Arizona
Docketed:April 25, 2016
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Arizona, Division One
  Case Nos.:(1 CA-CR 13-0635 PRPC)
  Decision Date:April 21, 2015
Discretionary Court  
  Decision Date:January 5, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 4 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 25, 2016)
May 11 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Arizona to respond filed.
May 25 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 9, 2016.
Jun 6 2016 Response Requested . (Due July 6, 2016)
Jun 29 2016 Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed.
Jul 11 2016 Reply of petitioner Scott Lee DeShaw filed.
Jul 14 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Oct 3 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 7, 2016.
Oct 11 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 14, 2016.
Oct 24 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 28, 2016.
Oct 31 2016 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Montgomery v. Louisiana, 577 U.S. ____ (2016). Justice Sotomayor concurs in the decision to grant, vacate, and remand. See Tatum v. Arizona, 580 U.S. ___ (2016) (Sotomayor, J., concurring). Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas joins, dissents from the decision to grant, vacate, and remand. See Tatum v. Arizona, 580 U.S. ___ (2016) (Alito, J., dissenting).
Dec 2 2016 MANDATE ISSUED.
Dec 2 2016 JUDGMENT ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Keith J. Hilzendeger Assistant Federal Public Defender(602) 382-2700
    Counsel of Record 850 West Adams Street
Suite 201
Phoenix, AZ  85007
keith_hilzendeger@fd.org
Party name: Scott Lee DeShaw
Attorneys for Respondent:
Diane M. Meloche Maricopa County Attorney's Office(602) 506-7422
    Counsel of Record 301 W. Jefferson Street, 2nd Floor
Phoenix, AZ  85003
dmeloche@mcao.maricopa.gov
Party name: Arizona
 
Adele G. Ponce Arizona Attorney General's Office(602) 542-4686
    Counsel of Record 1275 West Washington
Phoenix, AZ  85007
Adele.Ponce@azag.gov
Party name: Arizona

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543