Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-8850
No. 15-8850
Title:
Bobby Jerry Tatum, Petitioner
v.
Arizona
Docketed:April 7, 2016
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Arizona, Division Two
  Case Nos.:(2 CA-CR 2014-0460-PR)
  Decision Date:February 18, 2015
Discretionary Court  
  Decision Date:January 5, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 4 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 9, 2016)
Apr 20 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Arizona to respond filed.
May 4 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 19, 2016.
May 9 2016 Response Requested . (Due June 8, 2016)
May 27 2016 Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed.
Jun 9 2016 Reply of petitioner Bobby Jerry Tatum filed.
Jun 16 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Oct 3 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 7, 2016.
Oct 11 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 14, 2016.
Oct 24 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 28, 2016.
Oct 31 2016 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Montgomery v. Louisiana, 577 U. S. ____ (2016). Justice Sotomayor, concurring in the decision to grant, vacate, and remand. (Detached opinion). Justice Alito, with whom, Justice Thomas joins, dissenting from the decision to grant, vacate, and remand. (Detached Opinion)
Dec 2 2016 MANDATE ISSUED.
Dec 2 2016 JUDGMENT ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Sarah Stone 24 W. Camelback Road(602) 644-1380
    Counsel of RecordA458
Phoenix, AZ  85013
sarah@sarahstonelaw.com
Party name: Bobby Jerry Tatum
Attorneys for Respondent:
Diane M. Meloche Maricopa County Attorney's Office(602) 506-7422
    Counsel of Record 301 W. Jefferson Street, 2nd Floor
Phoenix, AZ  85003
dmeloche@mcao.maricopa.gov
Party name: Arizona
 
Jacinda A. Lanum Office of the Arizona Attorney General(520) 628-6511
400 W. Congress St., Suite 315
Tucson, AZ  85701
Party name: Arizona

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543