Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 15-8629
No. 15-8629
Title:
Alfrederick Jones, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 22, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-2882)
  Decision Date:November 9, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:January 22, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 18 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 21, 2016)
Apr 18 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 23, 2016.
Apr 21 2016 Brief amici curiae of Federal Public and Community Defenders, et al. filed.
May 13 2016 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
May 18 2016 Letter dated May 18, 2016, received from counsel for petitioner waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply brief pursuant to Rule 15.5.
May 18 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 2, 2016.
May 23 2016 Reply of petitioner Alfrederick Jones filed. (Distributed)
May 26 2016 Supplemental brief of petitioner Alfrederick Jones filed. (Distributed)
Jun 6 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 9, 2016.
Jun 8 2016 Second supplemental brief of petitioner Alfrederick Jones filed. (Distributed)
Jun 13 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2016.
Jun 20 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2016.
Mar 13 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 20 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Lisa B. Freeland Federal Public Defender(412) 644-6565
    Counsel of Record 1001 Liberty Avenue, Suite 1500
Pittsburgh, PA  15222
lisa_freeland@fd.org
Party name: Alfrederick Jones
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
Amy Baron-Evans Federal Defenders(617) 391-2253
National Sentencing Resource Counsel
51 Sleeper St., 5th Floor
Boston, MA  02210
abaronevans@gmail.com
Party name: Federal Public and Community Defenders, et al.
March 26, 2017 | Version 2014.2