Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-8089
No. 15-8089     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Michael Brandon Samra, Petitioner
v.
Cheryl Price, Warden
Docketed:February 8, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-14869)
  Decision Date:September 8, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:November 6, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 4 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 9, 2016)
Mar 9 2016 Brief of respondent Cheryl Price, Warden in opposition filed.
Mar 15 2016 Reply of petitioner Michael Brandon Samra filed.
Mar 24 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016.
Apr 18 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Alan M. Freedman Midwest Center for Justice, Ltd.(847) 492-1563
    Counsel of RecordP.O. Box 6528
Evanston, IL  60204
fbpc@aol.com
Party name: Michael Brandon Samra
Attorneys for Respondent:
Andrew L. Brasher Deputy Solicitor General(334) 353-2609
    Counsel of Record Office of Alabama Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL  36130
abrasher@ago.state.al.us
Party name: Cheryl Price, Warden

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543