Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-7313
No. 15-7313     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Rickey Alvis Bell, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:December 10, 2015
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Tennessee, Western Division
  Case Nos.:(W2012-02017-CCA-R3-DD)
  Decision Date:September 10, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 8 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 11, 2016)
Jan 20 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 10, 2016.
Jan 29 2016 Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Feb 8 2016 Reply of petitioner Rickey Alvis Bell, Jr. filed.
Feb 18 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 4, 2016.
Mar 1 2016 Record Requested .
Mar 22 2016 Record received from the Supreme Court of Tennessee. The record is electronic.
Mar 24 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016.
Mar 31 2016 Rescheduled.
Apr 18 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 22, 2016.
Apr 20 2016 Rescheduled.
Apr 25 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 29, 2016.
Apr 27 2016 Rescheduled.
May 9 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2016.
May 16 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
James A. Simmons P.O. Box 2934(615) 477-9987
    Counsel of RecordHendersonville, TN  37077
jas52@earthlink.net
Party name: Rickey Alvis Bell, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent:
James E. Gaylord Assistant Attorney General(615) 532-7356
    Counsel of Record Office of the Tennessee Attorney General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN  37202-0207
jim.gaylord@ag.tn.gov
Party name: Tennessee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543