Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-7059
No. 15-7059
Title:
Curtis J. Neeley, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Louis Jerry Edwards, et al.
Docketed:November 23, 2015
Linked with 15A368
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-1891)
  Decision Date:June 18, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 8 2015 Application (15A368) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 16, 2015 to November 15, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito.
Sep 16 2015 Application (15A368) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 16, 2015.
Nov 13 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 23, 2015)
Dec 7 2015 Waiver of right of respondents Louis Jerry Edwards, et al. to respond filed.
Dec 16 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 5 2016 Supplemental brief of petitioner Curtis J. Neeley, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 11 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Curtis J. Neeley Jr. 380 W. 13th Street
Newark, AR  72562
Party name: Curtis J. Neeley, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Talcott Camp Reproductive Freedom Project(212) 549-2632
    Counsel of RecordAmerican civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY  10004
tcamp@aclu.org
Party name: Louis Jerry Edwards, et al.
September 28, 2016 | Version 2014.2