Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-7
No. 15-7
Title:
Universal Health Services, Inc., Petitioner
v.
United States and Massachusetts, ex rel. Julio Escobar and Carmen Correa
Docketed:July 1, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-1423)
  Decision Date:March 17, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:April 14, 2015
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 30 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2015)
Jul 14 2015 Waiver of right of respondents United States and Massachusetts, ex rel. Julio Escobar and Carmen Correa to respond filed.
Jul 29 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Aug 4 2015 Response Requested . (Due September 3, 2015)
Aug 18 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 5, 2015.
Oct 5 2015 Brief of respondents United States and Massachusetts, ex rel. Julio Escobar and Carmen Correa in opposition filed.
Oct 20 2015 Reply of petitioner Universal Health Services, Inc. filed.
Oct 21 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 6, 2015.
Nov 9 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 13, 2015.
Nov 16 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 24, 2015.
Nov 30 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 4, 2015.
Dec 4 2015 Petition GRANTED limited to Questions 2 & 3 presented by the petition.
Jan 8 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondents.
Jan 19 2016 Joint appendix filed. (Two Volumes) (Statement of costs filed.)
Jan 19 2016 Brief of petitioner Universal Health Services, Inc. filed.
Jan 25 2016 Brief amici curiae of American Health Care Association and the National Center for Assisted Living filed.
Jan 25 2016 Brief amicus curiae of CareSource filed.
Jan 26 2016 Brief amicus curiae of CTIA-The Wireless Association filed.
Jan 26 2016 Brief amici curiae of American Hospital Association, et al. filed.
Jan 26 2016 Brief amici curiae of Interested Healthcare Providers filed.
Jan 26 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Association of Private Sector Colleges and Universities filed.
Jan 26 2016 Brief amici curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al. filed.
Jan 26 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Generic Pharmaceutical Association filed.
Jan 26 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Jan 26 2016 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Jan 26 2016 Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Jan 26 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Coalition for Government Procurement filed.
Jan 26 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Catholic Charities of the Diocese of Joliet, Inc. filed.
Jan 26 2016 Brief amici curiae of American Medical Association, et al. filed.
Feb 9 2016 The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including February 25, 2016.
Feb 25 2016 Brief of respondents United States and Massachusetts, ex rel. Julio Escobar and Carmen Correa filed.
Mar 2 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Professor Joel D. Hesch filed.
Mar 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed.
Mar 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Professor David Freeman Engstrom filed.
Mar 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of National Whistleblower Center filed.
Mar 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of the Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, et al. filed.
Mar 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund filed.
Mar 3 2016 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Mar 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of AARP filed.
Mar 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Mark McGrath filed.
Mar 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of States of Illinois, et al. filed.
Mar 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of The Commonwealth of Massachusetts filed.
Mar 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of Law Professors and Senior Lecturers of Law filed.
Mar 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of U.S. Senator Charles E. Grassley filed.
Mar 4 2016 SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, April 19, 2016
Mar 14 2016 Record requested from U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit.
Mar 15 2016 CIRCULATED.
Mar 21 2016 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Mar 28 2016 Reply of petitioner Universal Health Services, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Apr 6 2016 Record received from U.S.D.C. District of Massachusetts. The record is electronic and located on PACER with the exception of SEALED documents received in 1 Envelope.
Apr 6 2016 Record received from U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit is electronic and located on PACER, with the exception of the Joint Appendix contained in 1 envelope.
Apr 19 2016 Argued. For petitioner: Roy T. Englert, Jr., Washington, D. C. For respondents: David C. Frederick, Washington, D. C.; and Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae).
Jun 16 2016 Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Thomas, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.
Jul 18 2016 JUDGMENT ISSUED



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Roy T. Englert Jr. Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck,(202) 775-4500
    Counsel of Record Untereiner & Sauber LLP
1801 K Street, N.W., Suite 411L
Suite 411L
Washington, DC  20006
renglert@robbinsrussell.com
Party name: Universal Health Services, Inc.
 
M. Miller Baker McDermott Will & Emery LLP(202) 756-8000
500 North Capitol Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20001-1531
mbaker@mwe.com
Party name: Universal Health Services, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents:
David C. Frederick Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C.(202) 326-7951
    Counsel of Record1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC  20036
dfrederick@khhte.com
Party name: United States and Massachusetts, ex rel. Julio Escobar and Carmen Correa
 
Thomas M. Greene Greene LLP617-261-0040
One Liberty Square, Suite 1200
Boston, MA  02109
tgreene@greenellp.com
Party name: United States and Massachusetts, ex rel. Julio Escobar and Carmen Correa
 
Other:
Kelly R. Bagby AARP Foundation Litigation(202) 434-2060
601 E. Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20049
kbagby@aarp.org
Party name: AARP
 
Douglas R. Cox Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP(202) 955-8500
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20036
dcox@gibsondunn.com
Party name: Association of Private Sector Colleges and Universities
 
Jessica L. Ellsworth Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5886
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
Party name: American Hospital Association, et al.
 
John P. Elwood Vinson & Elkins LLP(202) 639-6500
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Suite 500 West
Washington, DC  20037
jelwood@velaw.com
Party name: Chamer of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
 
David Freeman Engstrom Stanford Law School(650) 721-5859
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA  94305
dfengstrom@law.stanford.edu
Party name: Professor David Freeman Engstrom
 
Philip S. Goldberg Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP(202) 783-8400
1155 F Street NW
Washington, DC  20004
pgoldberg@shb.com
Party name: American Medical Association, et al.
 
Joel D. Hesch Liberty University School of Law(434) 592-4251
1971 University Boulevard
Lynchburg, VA  24515
jhesch@liberty.edu
Party name: Professor Joel D. Hesch
 
Allyson N. Ho Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP(214) 466-4000
1717 Main Street, Suite 3200
Dallas, TX  75201-7347
aho@morganlewis.com
Party name: Coalition for Government Procurement
 
William M. Jay Goodwin Procter LLP(202) 346-4000
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
wjay@goodwinprocter.com
Party name: Generic Pharmaceutical Association
 
Paul E. Kalb Sidley Austin, LLP(202) 736-8000
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
pkalb@sidley.com
Party name: Interested Healthcare Providers
 
Robert L. King Korein Tillery LLC(312) 641-9750
205 N. Michigan Avenue
Suite 1950
Chicago, IL  60601-4269
rking@koreintillery.com
Party name: U.S. Senator Charles E. Grassley
 
Stephen M. Kohn Kohn Kohn & Colapinto, LLP(202) 342-6980
3233 P Street, NW
Washington, DC  20007
sk@kkc.com
Party name: National Whistleblower Center
 
James C. Martin Reed Smith LLP(412) 288-3131
225 Fifth Avenue, Suite 1200
Pittsburgh, PA  15222-2716
jcmartin@reedsmith.com
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
 
David W. Ogden Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP(202) 663-6440
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20006
david.ogden@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al.
 
Andrew J. Pincus Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3127
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006
apincus@mayerbrown.com
Party name: CTIA-The Wireless Association
 
Claire Prestel James & Hoffman PC(202) 496-0500
1130 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 950
Washington, DC  20036
cpprestel@jamhoff.com
Party name: the Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, et al.
 
Sanford Rosenblum Law Office of Sanford Rosenblum(519) 464-0444
110 Great Oaks Boulevard
Albany, NY  12203
srosenblumlaw@gmail.com
Party name: Mark McGrath
 
Richard A. Samp Washington Legal Foundation(202) 588-0302
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
rsamp@wlf.org
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
 
James F. Segroves Hooper, Lundy & Bookman, PC(202) 580-7700
401 Ninth Street, NW, Suite 550
Washington, DC  20004
jsegroves@health-law.com
Party name: American Health Care Association and the National Center for Assisted Living
 
Anne Marie Sferra Bricker & Eckler LLP(614) 227-2394
100 S. Third Street
Columbus, OH  43215
asferra@bricker.com
Party name: CareSource
 
Carolyn E. Shapiro Solicitor General(312) 814-5376
100 West Randolph Street
12th Floor
Chicago, IL  60601
cshapiro@atg.state.il.us
Party name: States of Illinois, et al.
 
Steven Tadros Sharobem Assistant Attorney General617-963-2227
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA  02108
steven.sharobem@state.ma.us
Party name: The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
 
Kenton J. Skarin Jones Day312-782-3939
77 West Wacker
Chicago, IL  60601-1692
kskarin@jonesday.com
Party name: Catholic Charities of the Diocese of Joliet, Inc.
 
Malcolm L. Stewart Deputy Solicitor General(202) 514-2201
Department of Justice
Washington, DC  20530
malcolm.l.stewart@usdoj.gov
Party name: United States
 
David S. Stone Stone Magnanini LLP(973) 218-1111
100 Connell Drive, Suite 2200
Berkeley Heights, NJ  07922
dstone@stonemagnalaw.com
Party name: Law Professors and Senior Lecturers of Law
 
Jennifer M. Verkamp Morgan Verkamp LLC(513) 651-4400
700 Walnut Street, Suite 400
Cincinnati, OH  45202
jverkamp@morganverkamp.com
Party name: Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: the United States
July 30, 2016 | Version 2014.1