Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-6918
No. 15-6918
Title:
Maltese Lavele Williams, Petitioner
v.
Wisconsin
Docketed:November 13, 2015
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wisconsin
  Case Nos.:(2014AP1099-CR)
  Decision Date:July 10, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 7 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 14, 2015)
Dec 1 2015 Waiver of right of respondent Wisconsin to respond filed.
Dec 16 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Dec 22 2015 Response Requested . (Due January 21, 2016)
Jan 7 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 22, 2016.
Feb 18 2016 Brief of respondent Wisconsin in opposition filed.
Mar 3 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2016.
Mar 21 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Adam Stevenson University of Wisconsin Law School(608) 262-9233
    Counsel of Record975 Bascom Mall
Madison, WI  53706
clastevenson@wisc.edu
Party name: Maltese Lavele Williams
Attorneys for Respondent:
Misha Tseytlin Solicitor General of Wisconsin(608) 267-9323
    Counsel of Record 17 W. Main Street
P.O. Box 7857
Madison, WI  53703
tseytlinm@doj.state.wi.us
Party name: Wisconsin
 
 

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543