Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-6877
No. 15-6877     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Richard Fairchild, Petitioner
v.
Maurice Warrior, Interim Warden
Docketed:November 9, 2015
Linked with 15A227
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-6030)
  Decision Date:April 23, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:June 9, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 19 2015 Application (15A227) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 7, 2015 to November 6, 2015, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Aug 25 2015 Application (15A227) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 6, 2015.
Nov 5 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 9, 2015)
Dec 9 2015 Brief of respondent Maurice Warrior, Interim Warden in opposition filed.
Dec 17 2015 Reply of petitioner Richard Fairchild filed.
Dec 23 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Randy Alan Bauman Office of the Federal Public Defender(405) 609-5930
215 Dean A. McGee, Suite 707
Oklahoma City, OK  73102
Party name: Richard Fairchild
Attorneys for Respondent:
Robert L. Whittaker Assistant Attorney General(405) 521-3921
    Counsel of Record Office of the Attorney General
313 N.E. 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK  73105
robert.whittaker@oag.ok.gov
Party name: Maurice Warrior, Interim Warden

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543