Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-666
No. 15-666
Title:
Taylor Bell, Petitioner
v.
Itawamba County School Board, et al.
Docketed:November 19, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-60264)
  Decision Date:August 20, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 17 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2015)
Dec 9 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 20, 2016.
Dec 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Marion B. Brechner First Amendment Project filed.
Dec 14 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Dec 21 2015 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Student Press Law Center, et al.
Dec 21 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Mississippi Center for Justice filed.
Dec 21 2015 Brief amici curiae of Advancement Project, and One Voice filed.
Dec 21 2015 Brief amici curiae of Erik Nielson, et al. filed.
Dec 21 2015 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Massachusetts Citizens for Children.
Jan 15 2016 Brief of respondent Itawamba County School Board in opposition filed.
Feb 2 2016 Reply of petitioner Taylor Bell filed.
Feb 3 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016.
Feb 29 2016 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Student Press Law Center, et al. GRANTED.
Feb 29 2016 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Massachusetts Citizens for Children GRANTED.
Feb 29 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Wilbur O. Colom Colom Law Firm(662) 327-0903
    Counsel of RecordP.O. Box 866
200 Sixth St. North
Suite 700
Columbus, MS  39703
wil@colom.com
Party name: Taylor Bell
Attorneys for Respondents:
Thomas R. Gerarde Howd & Ludorf, LLC(860) 249-1361
    Counsel of Record65 Wethersfield Avenue
Hartford, CT  06114
tgerarde@hl-law.com
Party name: Itawamba County School Board
 
Benjamin E. Griffith Griffith Law Firm(662) 238-7727
2086 Old Taylor Road, Suite 1023
Oxford, MS  38655
Party name: Itawamba County School Board
Other:
Charles E. Baruch Johnston Tobey Baruch(214) 741-6260
3308 Oak Grove Avenue
Dallas, TX  75204
chad@jtlaw.com
Party name: Erik Nielson, et al.
 
Mary T. Benton Alston & Bird LLP(404) 881-7255
One Atlantic Center
1201 West Peachtree Street
Suite 4200
Atlanta, GA  30309
mary.benton@alston.com
Party name: Massachusetts Citizens for Children
 
Clay Calvert Marion B. Brechner(352)-273-1096
First Amendment Project
2060 Weimer Hall
Gainesville, FL  32611
ccalvert@jou.ufl.edu
Party name: The Marion B. Brechner First Amendment Project
 
Scott Payne Martin Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP(202) 955-8500
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20036
smartin@gibsondunn.com
Party name: Advancement Project, and One Voice
 
Scott Lehman Sternberg Baldwin Haspel Burke & Mayer LLC504-568-2900
1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3600
New Orleans, LA  70163
sls@bhbmlaw.com
Party name: The Student Press Law Center, et al.
 
Daniel R. Walfish Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy, LLP(212) 530-5000
22 Liberty Street
New York, NY  10005
dwalfish@milbank.com
Party name: Mississippi Center for Justice
December 09, 2016 | Version 2014.2