Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-664
No. 15-664
Title:
Rod Blagojevich, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 19, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(11-3853)
  Decision Date:July 21, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:August 19, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 17 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2015)
Dec 16 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 20, 2016.
Dec 21 2015 Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Elected Officials, et al. filed.
Jan 7 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 19, 2016.
Feb 19 2016 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Mar 8 2016 Reply of petitioner Rod Blagojevich filed.
Mar 9 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 25, 2016.
Mar 28 2016 Petition DENIED.
Apr 22 2016 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Apr 22 2016 Motion to defer consideration of the petition for rehearing filed by petitioner.
May 3 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 19, 2016.
May 23 2016 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Leonard C. Goodman 53 W. Jackson Blvd.(312) 986-1984
    Counsel of RecordSuite 1650
Chicago, IL  60604
lcgoodman@rcn.com
Party name: Rod Blagojevich
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
Alan Roy Friedman Kramer, Levan, Naftalis & Frankel, LLP(212) 715-9300
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10036
afriedman@kramerlevin.com
Party name: Current and Former Elected Officials, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543