Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-650
No. 15-650     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Shonda Walter, Petitioner
v.
Pennsylvania
Docketed:November 17, 2015
Linked with 15A403
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Eastern District
  Case Nos.:(645 CAP)
  Decision Date:July 20, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 8 2015 Application (15A403) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 18, 2015 to November 17, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito.
Oct 14 2015 Application (15A403) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 17, 2015.
Nov 12 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 17, 2015)
Dec 2 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner
Dec 14 2015 Brief of respondent Pennsylvania in opposition filed.
Dec 14 2015 Brief amici curiae of Social Scientists filed.
Dec 16 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Witness to Innocence filed.
Dec 16 2015 Brief amici curiae of The Bar of Ireland, et al. filed.
Dec 23 2015 Reply of petitioner Shonda Walter filed.
Dec 30 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016.
Jan 15 2016 Rescheduled.
Jan 19 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 22, 2016.
Jan 25 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Daniel Silverman 123 Broad Street(215) 735-1771
    Counsel of RecordSuite 2500
Philadelphia, PA  19109
daniel.silverman@temple.edu
Party name: Shonda Walter
Attorneys for Respondent:
Susan Lynn DiGiacomo Office of the Attorney General610-631-5952
    Counsel of Record1000 Madison Avenue, Suite 310
Norristown, PA  19403
sdigiacomo@attorneygeneral.gov
Party name: Pennsylvania
 
Susan Lynn DiGiacomo 1000 Madison Avenue610-631-5952
    Counsel of RecordSuite 310
Norristown, PA  19403
sdigiacomo@attorneygeneral.gov
Party name: Pennsylvania
Other:
Jules Epstein Visiting Professor of law(215) 204-6288
Temple Beasley School of Law
1719 N. Broad Street
Philadelphia, PA  19122
jules.epstein@temple.edu
Party name: Social Scientists
 
Thomas H. Speedy Rice Washington & Lee University School of Law(540) 458-8521
Sydney Lewis Hall
Lexington, VA  24450
RiceS@wlu.edu
Party name: The Bar of Ireland, et al.
 
Jenifer Wicks 400 Seventh Street, N.W.(202) 393-3004
Suite 202
Washington, DC  20004
Jenifer@wickslaw.com
Party name: Witness to Innocence
December 08, 2016 | Version 2014.2