Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results

Docket for 15-646
No. 15-646
In Re Willie B. Sharp, Petitioner
Docketed:November 16, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 16 2015 Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed.
Nov 17 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 4, 2015.
Nov 30 2015 Response Requested . (Due December 30, 2015)
Dec 16 2015 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Dec 18 2015 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law Professors.
Dec 21 2015 Reply of petitioner In re Willie B. Sharp filed.
Dec 22 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law Professors GRANTED.
Jan 11 2016 Petition DENIED.

~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Amir H. Ali Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6000
    Counsel of Record1099 New York Ave., NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
Party name:
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: United States
Catherine E. Stetson Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5491
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
Party name: Law Professors


SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543