Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-6282
No. 15-6282
Title:
Robert Leslie Roberson, III, Petitioner
v.
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:September 29, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-70033)
  Decision Date:June 30, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 28 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 29, 2015)
Oct 9 2015 Letter dated October 9, 2015, from Seth Kretzer and James W. Volberding received.
Oct 12 2015 Letter dated October 12, 2015, from Lee B. Kovarsky received.
Oct 15 2015 Letter dated October 14, 2015, from James W. Volberding received.
Oct 28 2015 Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed.
Nov 17 2015 Reply of petitioner Robert Leslie Roberson, III filed.
Nov 18 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 4, 2015.
Nov 25 2015 Supplemental brief of petitioner Robert Leslie Roberson, III filed. (Distributed)
Dec 7 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Lee B. Kovarsky 500 West Baltimore Street(434) 466-8257
    Counsel of RecordRoom 436
Baltimore, MD  21201-1786
lkovarsky@law.umaryland.edu
Party name: Robert Leslie Roberson, III
Attorneys for Respondent:
Fredericka Sargent Assistant Attorney General(512) 936-1400
    Counsel of Record P. O. Box 12548
Capitol Station
Austin, TX  78711
Party name: William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543