Docket for 15-627
No. 15-627 | |
Title: |
Wayne Stenehjem, Attorney General of North Dakota, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
MKB Management Corporation, dba Red River Women's Clinic, et al. |
|
Docketed: | November 13, 2015 |
Linked with 15A387 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-2128) |
Decision Date: | July 22, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 7 2015 |
Application (15A387) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 20, 2015 to November 30, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Oct 13 2015 |
Application (15A387) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 30, 2015. |
Nov 10 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2015) |
Nov 23 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 23, 2015. |
Dec 10 2015 |
Brief amici curiae of Women Injured by Abortion, et al. filed. |
Dec 22 2015 |
Brief of respondents MKB Management Corporation, dba Red River Women's Clinic, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jan 5 2016 |
Reply of petitioners Wayne Stenehjem, Attorney General of North Dakota, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 6 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 22, 2016. |
Jan 25 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|