Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results

Docket for 15-626
No. 15-626
In Re Ronnie Glenn Triplett, Petitioner
Docketed:November 13, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 10 2015 Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed.
Dec 22 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Michael B. Kimberly Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3127
    Counsel of Record1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC  20006
Party name:


SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543