Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results

Docket for 15-625
No. 15-625
In Re Ronnie Glenn Triplett, Petitioner
Docketed:November 13, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 10 2015 Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due December 14, 2015)
Dec 7 2015 Waiver of right of respondents Carlos F. Lucero, David M. Ebel, Harris L. Hartz to respond filed.
Dec 14 2015 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Dec 21 2015 Reply of petitioner In Re Ronnie Glen Triplett filed.
Dec 22 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Michael B. Kimberly Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3127
    Counsel of Record1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC  20006
Party name:
Attorneys for Respondent:
Elisabeth A. Shumaker United State Court of Appeals for the 10th Circuit(303) 844-3157
    Counsel of RecordByron White U.S. Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street
Denver, CO  80257
Party name: Carlos F. Lucero, David M. Ebel, Harris L. Hartz
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: United States


SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543