Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 15-610
No. 15-610
Title:
Midland Funding, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Saliha Madden
Docketed:November 10, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-2131)
  Decision Date:May 22, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:August 12, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 10 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2015)
Nov 25 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners.
Dec 3 2015 Waiver of right of respondent Saliha Madden to respond filed.
Dec 9 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Dec 10 2015 Brief amici curiae of Clearing House Association LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed).
Dec 10 2015 Brief amicus curiae of ACA International filed.
Dec 10 2015 Brief amici curiae of The Structured Finance Industry Group, Inc., et al. filed.
Dec 10 2015 Brief amici curiae of American Bankers Association, et al. filed.
Dec 14 2015 Response Requested . (Due January 13, 2016)
Jan 6 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 12, 2016.
Feb 12 2016 Brief of respondent Saliha Madden in opposition filed.
Mar 2 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2016.
Mar 2 2016 Reply of petitioners Midland Funding, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 21 2016 The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 24 2016 Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Jun 7 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2016.
Jun 7 2016 Supplemental brief of petitioners Midland Funding, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jun 8 2016 Supplemental brief of respondent Saliha Madden filed. (Distributed)
Jun 27 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Kannon K. Shanmugam Williams & Connolly LLP(202) 434-5000
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
kshanmugam@wc.com
Party name: Midland Funding, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Daniel A. Schlanger Kakalec & Schlanger, LLP212-500-6114 x101
    Counsel of Record 85 Broadway St., 18th Floor
New York, NY  10004
dschlanger@kakalec-schlanger.com
Party name: Saliha Madden
Other:
Mark Haddad Sidley Austin LLP(213) 896-6000
555 West Fifth Street, Suite 4000
Los Angeles, CA  90013
mhaddad@sidley.com
Party name: The Structured Finance Industry Group, Inc., et al.
 
Michael Alexander Johnson Arnold & Porter, LLP(202) 942-5000
601 Maassachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20001
Michael.Johnson@aporter.com
Party name: American Bankers Association, et al.
 
Brian Ross Melendez Dykema Gossett, PLLC612 486-1589
4000 Wells Fargo Center
90 South Seventh Street
Minneapolis, MN  55402-3903
bmelendez@dykema.com
Party name: ACA International
 
Sharon L. Nelles Sullivan & Cromwell(212)-558-4000
125 Broad Street
New York, NY  10004
nelless@sullcrom.com
Party name: Clearing House Association LLC, et al.
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
March 26, 2017 | Version 2014.2