Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-599
No. 15-599
Title:
American Farm Bureau Federation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:November 9, 2015
Linked with 15A305
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-4079)
  Decision Date:July 6, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 17 2015 Application (15A305) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 4, 2015 to November 6, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito.
Sep 18 2015 Application (15A305) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 6, 2015.
Nov 6 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2015)
Nov 17 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners,
Dec 3 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 8, 2015.
Dec 7 2015 Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Dec 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Dec 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of Ninety-Two Members of Congress filed.
Dec 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of Lebanon County, Pennsylvania, et al. filed.
Dec 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of States of Kansas, Indiana, Missouri, and 19 Other States filed.
Dec 22 2015 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 19, 2016, for all respondents.
Jan 7 2016 Waiver of right of respondents Virginia Association of Municipal Wasteswater Agencies, Maryland Association of Municipal Wastewater Agencies, National Association of Clean Water Agencies, et al. to respond filed.
Jan 7 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents.
Jan 19 2016 Brief of Federal Respondent in opposition filed.
Jan 19 2016 Brief of respondents Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Jan 19 2016 Brief of respondent Intervenor Respondent Pennsylvania Municipal Authorities Association in opposition filed.
Feb 2 2016 Reply of petitioners American Farm Bureau Federation, et al. filed.
Feb 3 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016.
Feb 29 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Timothy S. Bishop Mayer Brown, LLP(202) 263-3000
    Counsel of Record1999 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
tbishop@mayerbrown.com
Party name: American Farm Bureau Federation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Steven Alan Hann Hamburg, Rubin, Mullin, Maxwell & Lupin(215) 661-0400
    Counsel of Record375 Morris Road
Lansdale, PA  19446
Party name: Intervenor Respondent Pennsylvania Municipal Authorities Association
 
Jon Alan Mueller Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc.(410) 268-8816
    Counsel of Record6 Herndon Avenue
Annapolis, MD  21403
jmueller@cbf.org
Party name: Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., et al.
 
Christopher Donald Pomeroy Aqua Law, PLC804-716-9021, ext. 202
    Counsel of Record 6 South 5th Street
Richmond, VA  23219
chris@AquaLaw.com
Party name: Virginia Association of Municipal Wasteswater Agencies, Maryland Association of Municipal Wastewater Agencies, National Association of Clean Water Agencies, et al.
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Federal Respondent.
Other:
Paul J. Beard II. Alston & Bird LLP(916) 498-3354
1115 11th Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
paul.beard@alston.com
Party name: Lebanon County, Pennsylvania, et al.
 
Bryan Charles Clark Assistant Solicitor General(785) 296-2215
120 SW 10th Avenue, 2nd Floor
Topeka, KS  66612
bryan.clark@ag.ks.org
Party name: States of Kansas, Indiana, Missouri, and 19 Other States
 
Damien M. Schiff Pacific Legal Foundation(916)-419-7111
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
dms@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, et al.
 
Richard E. Schwartz Crowell & Moring LLP(202) 624-2500
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20004
Party name: Ninety-Two Members of Congress
 
Catherine E. Stetson Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5600
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
August 23, 2016 | Version 2014.2