Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results

Docket for 15-578
No. 15-578
In Re Juan Deshannon Butler, Petitioner
Docketed:November 4, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 3 2015 Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed.
Nov 9 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 24, 2015.
Nov 18 2015 Response Requested . (Due December 18, 2015)
Nov 20 2015 Motion for leave to file amici brief of Law Professors filed.
Dec 14 2015 Motion to dismiss the petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to Rule 46 received.
Dec 14 2015 Letter of consent to the motion to dismiss the petition for writ of habeas corpus received.
Dec 14 2015 Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.

~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Amir H. Ali Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6000
    Counsel of Record1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
Party name:
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: United States
Catherine E. Stetson Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5491
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
Party name: Law Professors


SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543