Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 15-485
No. 15-485
Title:
Mark Warren Tetzlaff, Petitioner
v.
Educational Credit Management Corporation
Docketed:October 16, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-3702)
  Decision Date:July 22, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 15 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2015)
Nov 10 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 16, 2015.
Dec 16 2015 Brief of respondent Educational Credit Management Corporation in opposition filed.
Dec 21 2015 Reply of petitioner Mark Warren Tetzlaff filed.
Dec 22 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Douglas Hallward-Driemeier Ropes & Gray LLP(202) 508-4600
    Counsel of Record2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20006
Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
Party name: Mark Warren Tetzlaff
Attorneys for Respondent:
Natalie R. Eness ECMC(651) 325-3636
    Counsel of Record1 Imation Place, Bldg. 2
Oakdale, MN  55128
neness@ecmc.org
Party name: Educational Credit Management Corporation
May 28, 2017 | Version 2014.2