Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-448
No. 15-448
Title:
Joseph M. Beck, in His Official Capacity as Chairperson of the Arkansas State Medical Board, et al., Petitioners
v.
Louis Jerry Edwards, et al.
Docketed:October 9, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-1891)
  Decision Date:May 27, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:July 9, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 6 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2015)
Oct 26 2015 Waiver of right of respondents Louis Jerry Edwards, et al. to respond filed.
Oct 28 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 13, 2015.
Nov 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of 3,355 Women Injured by Abortion, et al. in support of partial affirmance and partial reversal filed.
Nov 10 2015 Response Requested . (Due December 10, 2015)
Dec 9 2015 Brief of respondents Louis Jerry Edwards, et al. in opposition filed.
Dec 18 2015 Reply of petitioners Joseph M. Beck, in His Official Capacity as Chairperson of the Arkansas State Medical Board, et al. filed.
Dec 30 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016.
Jan 19 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Colin Robert Jorgensen Assistant Attorney General(501) 682-2007
    Counsel of Record Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center Street, Suite 200
Little Rock, AR  72202
colin.jorgensen@arkansasag.gov
Party name: Joseph M. Beck, in His Official Capacity as Chairperson of the Arkansas State Medical Board, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Talcott Camp Reproductive Freedom Project(212) 549-2632
    Counsel of RecordAmerican civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY  10004
tcamp@aclu.org
Party name: Louis Jerry Edwards, et al.
Other:
Allan E. Parker Jr. The Justice Foundation(210) 614-7157
8023 Vantage Drive
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX  78230
aparker@txjf.org
Party name: 3,355 Women Injured by Abortion, et al. in support of partial affirmance and partial reversal
December 10, 2016 | Version 2014.2