Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-446
No. 15-446
Title:
Cuozzo Speed Technologies, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Michelle K. Lee, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office
Docketed:October 8, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(2014-1301)
  Decision Date:July 8, 2015
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 6 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2015)
Oct 20 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Nov 6 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 9, 2015.
Nov 9 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus cuirae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the United States.
Nov 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of 3M Company, et al. filed.
Nov 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Nov 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Biotechnology Industry Organization filed.
Nov 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Nov 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association filed.
Nov 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago filed.
Nov 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Nov 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of Interdigital, Inc., Tessera Technologies, Inc.,and Fallbrook Technologies, Inc. filed.
Nov 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Trading Technologoies International, Inc. filed.
Dec 4 2015 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 11, 2015.
Dec 11 2015 Brief of respondent Michelle K. Lee, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office in opposition filed.
Dec 18 2015 Reply of petitioner Cuozzo Speed Technologies, LLC filed.
Dec 22 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016.
Jan 15 2016 Petition GRANTED.
Feb 3 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Feb 22 2016 Brief of petitioner Cuozzo Speed Technologies, LLC filed.
Feb 22 2016 Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Cuozzo Speed Technologies, LLC.
Feb 25 2016 Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amici curiae of 3M Company, et al. filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amicus curiae of SightSound Technologies, LLC filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amici curiae of Patent-Practicing Technology Innovators filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amici curiae of InterDigital, Inc., Tessera Technologies, Inc., et al. filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Paul R. Michel in support of neither party filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Medtronic, Inc. in support of neither party filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amici curiae of Biotechnology Innovation Organization, et al. filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Federal Circuit Bar Association filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amicus curiae of the Association of the Bar of the City of New York filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Mitchell Hamline School of Law Intellectual Property Institute filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Gregory Dolin, et al. filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Patent Practitioners, Inc. filed.
Mar 4 2016 SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, April 25, 2016
Mar 7 2016 Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amicus curiae of The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago in support of neither party filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amicus curiae of International Business Machines Corporation in support of neither party filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amici curiae of Microsoft Corporation and Professors Vincent Chiappetta and Lee A. Hollaar in support of neither party filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association in support of neither party filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Licensing Executives Society (USA. and Canada), Inc. in support of neither party filed.
Mar 14 2016 Record requested from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit.
Mar 15 2016 CIRCULATED.
Mar 15 2016 Record received from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Mar 23 2016 Record received from the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is electronic.
Mar 23 2016 Brief of respondent Michelle K. Lee, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office filed. (Distributed)
Mar 29 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Public Knowledge filed. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2016 Brief amici curiae of CME Group, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2016 Brief amici curiae of Generic Pharmaceutical Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2016 Brief amici curiae of Dell, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2016 Brief amicus curiae of EMC Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Apple, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2016 Brief amici curiae of The American Bankers Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2016 Brief amicus curiae of AARP filed. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Unified Patents Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Apr 15 2016 Reply of petitioner Cuozzo Speed Technologies, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Apr 25 2016 Argued. For petitioner: Garrard R. Beeney, New York, N. Y. For respondent: Curtis E. Gannon, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
Jun 20 2016 Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Breyer, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court with respect to Parts I and III, and the opinion of the Court with respect to Part II, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Thomas, Ginsburg, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a concurring opinion. Alito, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part, in which Sotomayor, J., joined.
Jul 22 2016 JUDGMENT ISSUED



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Garrard R. Beeney Sullivan & Cromwell LLP(212) 558-4000
    Counsel of Record125 Broad Street
New York, NY  10004-2498
beeneyg@sullcrom.com
Party name: Cuozzo Speed Technologies, LLC
 
Jeffrey B. Wall Sullivan & Cromwell LLP(202) 956-7500
    Counsel of Record1700 New York Ave., N.W., Suite 700
Washington, DC  20006
wallj@sullcrom.com
Party name: Cuozzo Speed Technologies, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Michelle K. Lee, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office
 
Curtis E. Gannon Assistant to the Solicitor General
Department of Justice
Washington, DC  20530
Party name: Michelle K. Lee, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office
Other:
David L. Applegate Williams Montgomery & John Ltd.(312) 443-3200
6100 Willis Tower
233 South Wqcker Drive
Chicago, IL  60606
dla@willmont.com
Party name: The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago in support of neither party
 
Jeffrey A. Birchak Fallbrook Technologies Inc.(512) 519-0305
2620 Brushy Creek Look
Cedar Park, TX  78613
jbirchak@fallbrooktech.net
Party name: Interdigital, Inc., Tessera Technologies, Inc.,and Fallbrook Technologies, Inc.
 
Steven F. Borsand Trading Technologies International(312) 476-1000
222 South Riverside Plaza
Suite1100
Chicago, IL  60606
steve.borsand@tradingtechnologies.com
Party name: Trading Technologoies International, Inc.
 
Richard P. Bress Latham & Watkins LLP(202) 637-2200
555 11th Street, N.W.
Suite 1000
Washington, DC  20004
rick.bress@lw.com
Party name: InterDigital, Inc., Tessera Technologies, Inc., et al.
 
Adam H. Charnes Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP(336) 607-7300
1001 West Fourth Street
Winston-Salem, NC  27101
acharnes@kilpatricktownsend.com
Party name: The American Bankers Association, et al.
 
Morgan Chu Irell & Manella LLP(310) 277-1010
1800 Avenue of the Stars
Suite 900
Los Angeles, CA  90067-4276
mchu@irell.com
Party name: Federal Circuit Bar Association
 
Eric F. Citron Goldstein & Russell, P.C.(202) 362-0636
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD  20814
ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
Party name: Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC
 
Paul D. Clement Bancroft PLLC(202) 234-0090
500 New Jersey Ave., NW
Seventh Floor
Washington, DC  20001
pclement@bancroftpllc.com
Party name: International Business Machines Corporation in support of neither party
 
Charles Duan Public Knowledge(202) 861-0020
1818 N Street, NW, Suite 410
Washington, DC  20036
cduan@publicknowledge.org
Party name: Public Knowledge
 
David Bartley Eppenauer Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP(425) 765-0650
701 Fifth Avenue
Suite 6800
Redmond, WA  98104
beppenauer@shb.com
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Association in support of neither party
 
Barbara A. Fiacco Foley Hoag LLP(617) 832-1000
155 Seaport Boulevard
Boston, MA  02210
bfiacco@foleyhoag.com
Party name: 3M Company, et al.
 
Mark C. Fleming Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr, LLP(617) 526-6000
60 State Street
Boston, MA  02109
mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Medtronic, Inc.
 
Eugene Martin Gelernter Paterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP0212-336-2000
1133 Avenue of the Amer.icas
New York, NY  10036
emgelernter@pbwt.com
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
 
Joseph J. Gleason Gleason Law LLC(404) 594-3550
780 Morosgo Drive #14084
Atlanta, GA  30324
joe@gleasonlegal
Party name: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
 
Joseph R. Guerra Sidley Austin LLP(202) 736-8000
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
jguerra@sidley.com
Party name: Apple, Inc.
 
Herbert Davis Hart III. McAndrews Held & Malloy, Ltd.312-775-800
500 West Madison Street
Suite 3400
Chicago, IL  60661
hhart@mcandrews-ip.com
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party
 
Charles Hieken Fish & Richardson PC(617) 542-5070
One Marina Park Drive
Boston, MA  02210
hieken@fr.com
Party name: Paul R. Michel
 
Thomas G. Hungar Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP(202) 955-8500
1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
thungar@gibsondunn.com
Party name: EMC Corporation
 
William M. Jay Goodwin Procter LLP(202) 346-4000
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
wjay@goodwinprocter.com
Party name: Biotechnology Industry Organization
 
Barbara A. Jones AARP Foundation Litigation(626) 585-2628
200 So. Los Robles, Suite 400
Pasadena, CA  91101
bjones@aarp.org
Party name: AARP
 
Miranda Yan Jones Heim Payne and Chorush LLP713-221-2000
600 Travis Street, Suite 6710
Houston, TX  77002
mjones@hpcllp.com
Party name: Law Professors Gregory Dolin, et al.
 
Neal K. Katyal Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5600
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
Party name: Patent-Practicing Technology Innovators
 
Scott A. McKeown Oblon McClelland Maier & Neustadt LLP(703) 412-6297
1940 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA  22314
smckeown@oblon.com
Party name: Unified Patents Inc.
 
John Mills II. Patent Counsel Group LLP(703) 338-7090
The Commonwealth Building
2045 North 15th Street, Suite 205
Arlington, VA  22202
john.g.mills@patentcounselgroup
Party name: the Association of the Bar of the City of New York
 
R. Carl Moy Mitchell Hamline School of Law(651) 290-6344
Intellectual Property Institute
875 Summit Avenue
St. Paul, MN  55105
Party name: Mitchell Hamline School of Law Intellectual Property Institute
 
William Brian Richards The Richards Law Firm LLC(614) 939-1488
1262 Pond Hollow Lane
New Albany, OH  43054
wrichards@wbrfirm.com
Party name: National Association of Patent Practitioners, Inc.
 
Chad Michael Ruback 8117 Preston Road Suite 300(214)-522-4243
Dallas, TX  75225
Party name: Generic Pharmaceutical Association, et al.
 
Pratik A. Shah Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP(202) 887-4000
1333 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20036
pshah@akingump.com
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
 
Charles W. Shifley Banner & Witcoff Ltd.(312) 463-5000
10 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 3000
Chicago, IL  60606
cshifley@bannerwitcoff.com
Party name: Licensing Executives Society (USA. and Canada), Inc. in support of neither party
 
Aaron M. Streett Baker Botts L.L.P.(713) 229-1855
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX  77002-4995
aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
Party name: CME Group, Inc., et al.
 
John Thorne Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel PLLC(202) 326-7900
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC  20036
jthorne@khhte.com
Party name: Dell, et al.
 
John D. Vandenberg Klarquist Sparkman LLP(503)-595-5300
121 S.W.Salmon Street
Suite 1600
Portland, OR  97204
john.vandenberg@klarquist.com
Party name: Microsoft Corporation and Professors Vincent Chiappetta and Lee A. Hollaar in support of neither party
 
Matthew McManus Wolf Arnold & Porter LLP202-942-5462
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20001
Matthew.Wolf@aporter.com
Party name: SightSound Technologies, LLC
August 25, 2016 | Version 2014.2