Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-424
No. 15-424
Title:
Electronic Arts Inc., Petitioner
v.
Michael E. Davis, et al.
Docketed:October 6, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-15737)
  Decision Date:January 6, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:July 10, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 5 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 5, 2015)
Nov 3 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 8, 2015.
Nov 4 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Thomas Jefferson Center for Protection of Free Expression filed.
Nov 4 2015 Brief amici curiae of 31 Constitutional Law and Intellectual Property Law Professors filed.
Nov 5 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Entertainment Software Association filed.
Nov 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed.
Dec 8 2015 Brief of respondents Michael E. Davis, et al. in opposition filed.
Dec 21 2015 Reply of petitioner Electronic Arts Inc. filed.
Dec 22 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 4 2016 Rescheduled.
Mar 2 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2016.
Mar 2 2016 Supplemental brief of petitioner Electronic Arts Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 21 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Paul M. Smith Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6060
    Counsel of Record1099 New York Avenue, N.W.
Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
psmith@jenner.com
Party name: Electronic Arts Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Brian D. Henri Henri Law Group(650) 614-5087
    Counsel of Record640 W. California Avenue
Suite 210
Sunnyvale, CA  94086
brianhenri@henrilg.com
Party name: Michael E. Davis, et al.
Other:
Daniel K. Nazer Staff Attorney(415)-436-9333
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA  94109
daniel@eff.org
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al.
 
Nathan E. Siegel Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, L.L.P.(202) 508-1100
1899 L Street, NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC  20036
nsiegel@lskslaw.com
Party name: Entertainment Software Association
 
Eugene Volokh Scott & Cyan Banister(310) 206-3926
Amicus Brief Clinic
UCLA School of Law
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA  90095
volokh@law.ucla.edu
Party name: 31 Constitutional Law and Intellectual Property Law Professors
 
J. Joshua Wheeler Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression(434) 295-4784
400 Worrell Drive
Charlottesville, VA  22911
jjw@tjcenter.org
Party name: Thomas Jefferson Center for Protection of Free Expression
August 31, 2016 | Version 2014.2