Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-406
No. 15-406
Title:
The Ritz-Carlton Development Company, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Krishna Narayan, et al.
Docketed:October 2, 2015
Linked with 15A221
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Hawaii
  Case Nos.:(SCWC-12-0000819)
  Decision Date:June 3, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 20 2015 Application (15A221) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 1, 2015 to October 1, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Aug 21 2015 Application (15A221) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until October 1, 2015.
Oct 1 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2015)
Oct 27 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 2, 2015.
Oct 30 2015 Brief amicus curiae of American Resort Development Association filed.
Nov 2 2015 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Dec 2 2015 Brief of respondents Krishna Narayan, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Dec 17 2015 Supplemental brief of respondents Krishna Narayan, et al. filed. VIDED.
Dec 22 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Dec 22 2015 Reply of petitioners The Ritz-Carlton Development Co., Inc., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Jan 11 2016 Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of DIRECTV, Inc. v. Imburgia, 577 U. S. ___ (2015).
Jan 11 2016 MANDATE ISSUED.
Feb 12 2016 JUDGMENT ISSUED
Feb 12 2016 MANDATE ISSUED



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Andrew J. Pincus Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3127
    Counsel of Record1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006-1101
apincus@mayerbrown.com
Party name: The Ritz-Carlton Development Co., Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Mark J. Bennett Starn O'Toole Marcus & Fisher(808) 537-6100
    Counsel of Record733 Bishop Street, Suite 1900
Honolulu, HI  96813
Party name: Krishna Narayan, et al.
 
Seth P. Waxman Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP(202) 663-6000
    Counsel of Record1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Krishna Narayan, et al.
Other:
Mark Jay Levin Ballard Spahr, LLP(215) 864-8235
1735 Market Street, 51st Floor
Philadelphia, PA  19103
levinmj@ballardspahr.com
Party name: American Resort Development Association
 
Thomas Ryan McCarthy Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC703-243-9423
3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA  22201
tom@consovoymccarthy.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
February 26, 2017 | Version 2014.2