Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-330
No. 15-330
Title:
California Building Industry Association, Petitioner
v.
City of San Jose, California, et al.
Docketed:September 16, 2015
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
  Case Nos.:(S212072)
  Decision Date:June 15, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 14 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 16, 2015)
Sep 29 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners.
Oct 7 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 16, 2015, for all respondents.
Oct 15 2015 Brief amici curiae of California Association of Realtors, et al. filed.
Oct 16 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Oct 16 2015 Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders filed.
Oct 16 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Oct 16 2015 Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Oct 16 2015 Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, and Reason Foundation filed.
Oct 19 2015 Brief amici curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al. filed.
Nov 5 2015 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 4, 2015, for all respondents.
Dec 4 2015 Brief of respondents City of San Jose, San Jose City Council, and Mayor of San Jose in opposition filed.
Dec 4 2015 Brief of Respondents-Intervenors Affordable Housing Networkof Santa Clara County, et al. in opposition filed.
Dec 17 2015 Reply of petitioner California Building Industry Association filed.
Dec 22 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 7 2016 Rescheduled.
Jan 11 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016.
Jan 14 2016 Rescheduled.
Jan 19 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 22, 2016.
Jan 21 2016 Rescheduled.
Feb 8 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016.
Feb 29 2016 Petition DENIED Justice Thomas, concurring in the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Brian T. Hodges Pacific Legal Foundation(425) 576-0484
    Counsel of Record10940 NE 33rd Place
Suite 210
Bellevue, WA  98004
bth@pacificlegal.org
Party name: California Building Industry Association
Attorneys for Respondents:
Daniel S. Volchok Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP(202) 663-6000
    Counsel of Record1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20006
daniel.volchok@wilmerhale.com
Party name: City of San Jose, San Jose City Council, and Mayor of San Jose
 
Malgorzata Laskowska Sr. Deputy City Attorney(408) 535-1965
City of San Jose, Office of the City Attorney
200 East Santa Clara, 16th Floor Tower
San Jose, CA  95113-1905
Party name: City of San Jose, California, et al.
 
Michael Rawson The Public Interest Law Project(510) 891-9794
449 15th Street, Suite 301
Oakland, CA  94612
mrawson@pilpca.org
Party name: Public Interest Law Project, Intervenor
Other:
June Babiracki Barlow Vice President and General Counsel(213) 739-8200
California Association of Realtors
525 South Virgil Avenue
Los Angeles, CA  90020-1403
juneb@car.org
Party name: California Association of Realtors, et al.
 
Anthony T. Caso Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence(714) 628-2666
c/o Dale E. Fowler School of Law at Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA  92886
caso@chapman.edu
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
 
Devala Anant Janardan National Association of Home Builders(202)-266-8335
1201 15th Street NW
Washington, DC  20005
djanardan@nahb.org
Party name: National Association of Home Builders
 
Steven J. Lechner Mountain States Legal Foundation(303) 292-2021
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO  80227
lechner@mountainstateslegal.com
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation
 
John J. Park Jr. Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP(678) 347-2208
1170 Peachtree Street NE, Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA  30309
jjp@sbllaw.net
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al.
 
Michael H. Park Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC(703) 243-9423
3 Columbus Circle, 15th Floor
New York, NY  10019
park@consovoy mccarthy.com
Party name: Cato Institute, and Reason Foundation
 
Luke Anthony Wake NFIB Small Business Legal Center(202) 314-2048
1201 F St. N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC  20004
luke.wake@nfib.org
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al..
July 18, 2016 | Version 2014.1