Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-326
No. 15-326
Title:
Automated Merchandising Systems, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Michelle K. Lee, Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Docketed:September 15, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-1728)
  Decision Date:April 10, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:June 15, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 11 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2015)
Oct 9 2015 Waiver of right of respondent Michelle K. Lee, Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office to respond filed.
Oct 14 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2015.
Nov 2 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
James D. Berquist Davidson, Berquist, Jackson & Gowdey, LLP(571) 765-7700
    Counsel of Record8300 Greensboro Dr., Suite 500
McLean, VA  22102
jay.berquist@davidsonberquist.com
Party name: Automated Merchandising Systems, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Michelle K. Lee, Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543