Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-298
No. 15-298
Title:
OMG, L.P., et al., Petitioners
v.
Heritage Auctions, Inc.
Docketed:September 9, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-10403)
  Decision Date:May 8, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:June 10, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 4 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2015)
Oct 8 2015 Brief of respondent Heritage Auctions, Inc. in opposition filed.
Oct 28 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 13, 2015.
Nov 16 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Benjamin G. Shatz Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP(310) 312-4000
11355 West Olympic Boulevard
Los Angles, CA  90064-1632
bshatz@manatt.com
Party name: OMG, L.P., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Mark William Bayer Barnes & Thornburg, LLP(214) 258-4101
    Counsel of Record2100 McKinney Avenue, Suite 1250
Dallas, TX  75201-4761
Mark.Bayer@btlaw.com
Party name: Heritage Auctions, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543