Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-278
No. 15-278
Title:
Amgen Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Steve Harris, et al.
Docketed:September 4, 2015
Linked with 15A157
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(10-56014)
  Decision Date:May 26, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 7 2015 Application (15A157) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 24, 2015 to September 3, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Aug 17 2015 Application (15A157) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 3, 2015.
Sep 3 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 5, 2015)
Sep 25 2015 Waiver of right of respondents Steve Harris, et al. to respond filed.
Oct 2 2015 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Benefits Council.
Oct 5 2015 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Washington Legal Foundation.
Oct 7 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2015.
Oct 14 2015 Response Requested . (Due November 13, 2015)
Nov 13 2015 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Nov 13 2015 Brief of respondents Steve Harris, et al. in opposition filed.
Dec 1 2015 Reply of petitioners Amgen Inc., et al. filed.
Dec 2 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016.
Jan 19 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 22, 2016.
Jan 25 2016 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Benefits Council GRANTED.
Jan 25 2016 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Washington Legal Foundation GRANTED.
Jan 25 2016 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. GRANTED.
Jan 25 2016 Petition GRANTED. Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion)
Feb 26 2016 Judgment Issued



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Seth P. Waxman Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP(202) 663-6000
    Counsel of Record1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Amgen Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Mark C. Rifkin Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz(212) 545-4600
    Counsel of Record270 Madison Avenue
New York, NY  10016
rifkin@whafh.com
Party name: Steve Harris, et al.
 
Thomas James McKenna Gainey McKenna & Egleston212-983-1300
440 Park Avenue South Fifth Floor
New York, NY  10016
tjmckenna@gme-law.com
Party name: Steve Harris, et al.
Other:
Cory L. Andrews Washington Legal Foundation(202)-588-0302
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
candrews@wlf.org
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
 
George T. Conway III. Wachtel Lipton Rosen & Katz(212) 403-1000
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY  10019
gtconway@wlrk
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
 
Christopher J. Rillo Maynard Cooper& Gale LLP(415) 704-7433
275 Battery Street
Suite 1350
San Francisco, CA  94111
crillo@maynardcooper.com
Party name: American Benefits Council
February 24, 2017 | Version 2014.2