Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-274
No. 15-274
Title:
Whole Woman's Health, et al., Petitioners
v.
John Hellerstedt, Commissioner, Texas Department of State Health Services, et al.
Docketed:September 4, 2015
Linked with 14A1288
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-50928)
  Decision Date:June 9, 2015
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 19 2015 Application (14A1288) for a stay of mandate pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Scalia.
Jun 24 2015 Response to application (14A1288) requested by Justice Scalia, due Friday, June 26, 2015, by 4:00 ET.
Jun 25 2015 Response to application from respondent Kirk Cole, Commissioner, Texas Department of State Health Services, et al. filed.
Jun 26 2015 Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Texas Eagle Forum, et al.
Jun 26 2015 Reply of applicant Whole Woman's Health, et al. filed.
Jun 29 2015 Application (14A1288) referred to the Court.
Jun 29 2015 The application for stay presented to Justice Scalia and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the issuance of the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit in case No. 14-50928 is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the judgment of this Court. The Chief Justice, Justice Scalia, Justice Thomas, and Justice Alito would deny the application.
Sep 2 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 5, 2015)
Oct 5 2015 Brief of respondents Kirk Cole, Commissioner, Texas Department of State Health Services, et al. in opposition filed.
Oct 5 2015 Brief amicus curiae of American Public Health Association filed.
Oct 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al. filed.
Oct 5 2015 Brief amicus curiae of National Abortion Federation filed.
Oct 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed.
Oct 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of Professors Michael Dorf, Helen Hershkoff, Gillian Metzger, Neil Siegel, and David Strauss filed.
Oct 16 2015 Reply of petitioners Whole Woman's Health, et al. filed.
Oct 21 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 6, 2015.
Nov 9 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 13, 2015.
Nov 13 2015 Petition GRANTED.
Dec 23 2015 SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, March 2, 2016
Dec 23 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Legal Defense for Unborn Children in support of neither party filed.
Dec 28 2015 Brief of petitioners Whole Woman's Health, et al. filed.
Dec 28 2015 Joint appendix filed (7 Volumes). (Statement of costs filed)
Dec 28 2015 Motion to file Volume VIII of the joint appendix under seal filed by petitioners Whole Woman's Health, et al.
Dec 29 2015 Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Dec 30 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Facility Guidelines Institute in support of neither party filed.
Dec 30 2015 Brief amici curiae of Theologians and Ethicists filed.
Dec 30 2015 Brief amici curiae of Kate Banfield, et al. filed.
Dec 31 2015 Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Melissa Murray, et al. filed.
Dec 31 2015 Brief amici curiae of Republican Majority for Choice, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Health Economists filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Advocates for Youth filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Experts in Health Policy filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Institute for Women's Policy Research, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Jane's Due Process, Inc. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Public Health Deans, Department Chairs, and Faculty and the American Public Health Association filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Physicians Alliance, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Scientists, Science Educators, Skeptics, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Society of Hospital Medicine and Society of OB/Gyn Hospitalists filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Social Science Researchers filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars Ashutosh Bhagwat, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Texas Association Against Sexual Assault, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Network of Abortion Funds and 41 Member Abortion Funds filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Janice MacAvoy, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amicus curiae of New York City Bar Association filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Information Society Project at Yale Law School filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Abortion Federation and Abortion Providers filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Physicians for Reproductive Health filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of 163 Members of Congress filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Historians Eileen Boris, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Planned Parenthood Federation of America, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Center for Lesbian Rights, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Twelve Organizations Dedicated to the Fight for Reproductive Justice filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Latina Institute for Reproductive Health, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Experts and Organizations Supporting Survivors of Intimate Partner Violence filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Medical Staff Professionals filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Honorable Wendy Davis, Teresa Fedor, Lucy Flores, and Judy Nicastro filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Ten Pennsylvania Abortion Care Providers filed.
Jan 4 2016 Record requested from U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Judson Memorial Church, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Freedom and Individual Rights in Medicine (FIRM), et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Advocates for Pregnant Women, et al. filed.
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of The City of New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Service Women's Action Network and Retired or Former Military Officers filed. (Distributed)
Jan 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Business Leaders filed. (Distributed)
Jan 5 2016 Record received from U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Jan 12 2016 Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by Indiana Tech Law School Amicus Project (Distributed)
Jan 15 2016 CIRCULATED.
Jan 15 2016 Motion to allow counsel, or Guardian Ad Litem, to represent all unborn persons.
Jan 19 2016 Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 22, 2016.
Jan 22 2016 Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Life Committee filed. (Distributed)
Jan 25 2016 Motion for leave to file Volume VIII of the joint appendix under seal GRANTED.
Jan 26 2016 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Jan 27 2016 Brief of respondents John Hellerstedt, Commissioner, Texas Department of State Health Services, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 27 2016 Brief amici curiae of University Faculty for Life and Texas Alliance for Life Trust Fund filed. (Distributed)
Jan 27 2016 Brief amici curiae of Former Abortion Providers, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 28 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin filed. (Distributed)
Jan 29 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Right to Life Advocates, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 1 2016 Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 2 2016 Record received from U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit. (2 Boxes)
Feb 2 2016 Brief amici curiae of American Center for Law & Justice, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 2 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Legal Center for Defense of Life filed. (Distributed)
Feb 2 2016 Brief amici curiae of 3,348 Women Injured by Abortion, and The Justice Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Feb 2 2016 Brief amici curiae of Democrats for Life, and National Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed).
Feb 2 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Justice and Freedom Fund filed. (Distributed)
Feb 2 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Priests for Life filed. (Distributed)
Feb 2 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Live Action filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Record received from U.S.D.C. Western District of Texas. (2 Boxes)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of Texas Eagle Forum, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Illinois Right to Life filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of More Than 450 Bipartisan and Bicameral State Legislators and Lieutenant Governors filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Physicians with Experience Treating Women in Rural or Emergency Settings filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Group of 174 United States Senators and Members of the United States House of Representatives filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan and Bicameral Coalition of 121 Texas Legislators filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of CatholicVote.org Legal Defense Fund, et al. (Distributed) filed.
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of 24 Scholars of Federalism filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of Operation Rescue, and National Hispanic Christian Leadership Conference/CONELA filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of Texas Values, and 3801 Lancaster Film Project filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Physicians and Surgeons, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of CitizenLink, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of And Then There Were None filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of Conservative Legal Defense and Educational Fund, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of African American and Hispanic American Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of Governors of Texas, Alabama, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of Concerned Women for America, and Susan B. Anthony List filed. (Distributed)
Feb 18 2016 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Feb 18 2016 Motion to allow counsel, or Guardian Ad Litem, to represent all unborn persons DENIED.
Feb 18 2016 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Indiana Tech Law School Amicus Project Out of Time GRANTED.
Feb 23 2016 Reply of petitioners Whole Woman's Health, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2016 Argued. For petitioners: Stephanie Toti, New York, N. Y.; and Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae). For respondents: Scott A. Keller, Solicitor General of the State of Texas, Austin, Tex.
Jun 27 2016 Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Breyer, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Kennedy, Ginsburg, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Ginsburg, J., filed a concurring opinion. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, J., joined.
Jul 29 2016 JUDGMENT ISSUED
Aug 18 2016 Records from U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit and U.S.D.C. Western District of Texas has been returned.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Stephanie Toti Center for Reproductive Rights(917)-637-3684
    Counsel of Record199 Water Street, 22nd Floor
New York, NY  10038
stoti@reprorights.org
Party name: Whole Woman's Health, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Scott A. Keller Solicitor General of the State of Texas(512) 936-1700
    Counsel of Record Office of the Attorney General of Texas
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX  78711-2548
scott.keller@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Party name: John Hellerstedt, Commissioner, Texas Department of State Health Services, et al.
Other:
Steven H. Aden Alliance Defending Freedom(202) 393-8690
801 G Street, N.W., Suite 509
Washington, DC  20001
saden@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
Party name: American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al.
 
Sara Ainsworth Legal Voice(206) 650-2170
907 Pine Street, Suite 500
Seattle, WA  98101
sainsworth@comcast.net
Party name: Experts and Organizations Supporting Survivors of Intimate Partner Violence
 
Allan J. Arffa Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP(212) 373-3000
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10019
aarffa@paulweiss.com
Party name: Janice MacAvoy, et al.
 
Andrew David Beck American Civil Liberties Union Foundation(212) 549-2500
125 Broad Street
New York, NY  10004
abeck@aclu.org
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union, et al.
 
Boris Bershteyn Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP212-735-3834
Four Times Square
New York, NY  10036
boris.bershteyn@skadden.com
Party name: National Physicians Alliance, et al.
 
Asim M. Bhansali Keker & Van Nest LLP(415) 391-5400
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA  94111-1809
abhansali@kvn.com
Party name: Health Economists
 
James D. Blacklock Office of the Governor(512) 936-0181
P.O. Box 12428
Austin, TX  78711
jimmy.blacklock@gov.texas.gov
Party name: The Governors of Texas, Alabama, et al.
 
Katharine Elizabeth Sinclair Bodde Chair, Sex and Law Committee2126073375
The New York City Bar Association
125 Broad Street
NYC, NY  10004
kesbodde@gmail.com
Party name: New York City Bar Association
 
James Bopp Jr. The Bopp Law Firm, PC(812) 232-2434
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN  47807
jboppjr@aol.com
Party name: National Right to Life Committee
 
Gretchen Ranley Borchelt 11 Dupont Circle, Suite 800 (202)-588-5180
Washington, DC  20036
gborchelt@nwlc.org
Party name: National Women's Law Center, et al.
 
David C. Boyle P.O. Box 15143 (734)-904-6132
Long Beach, CA  90815
dbo@boyleslaw.org
Party name: David Boyle
 
Stephen L. Braga Law Office of Stephen L. Braga PLLC(703) 623-3180
3079 Woods Cove Lane
Woodbridge, VA  22192
bragalaw@gmail.com
Party name: Live Action
 
Thomas Brejcha Jr. Thomas More Society(312) 782-1680
29 South LaSalle Street
Suite 440
Chicago, IL  60603
Party name: Illinois Right to Life
 
Zachary W. Carter Corporation Counsel of the City of New York(212) 356-2500
100 Church Street
New York, NY  10007
rdearing@law.nyc.gov
Party name: The City of New York, et al.
 
Stephen Casey Texas Center for Defense of Life(512) 763-9068
501 S. Austin Avenue, Ste 1130
Georgetown, TX  78626
stephen@caseylawoffice.us
Party name: And Then There Were None
 
Teresa Stanton Collett University of St. Thomas School of Law(651) 962-4973
MSL 400
1000 LaSalle Avenue
Minneapolis, MN  55403-2015
tscollett@stthomas.edu
Party name: Physicians with Experience Treating Women in Rural or Emergency Settings
 
Charles J. Cooper Cooper & Kirk, PLLC(202) 220-9600
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Party name: Bipartisan Group of 174 United State Senators and Members of the United States House of Representatives
 
Craig E. Countryman Fish & Richardson, P.C.(858) 678-5070
12390 El Camino Real
San Diego, CA  92130
countryman@fr.com
Party name: Theologians and Ethicists
 
Michael J. Dell Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP(212) 715-9100
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10036
mdell@kramerlevin.com
Party name: Kate Banfield, et al.
 
Walter Dellinger O'Melveny & Myers LLP(202) 383-5319
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
wdellinger@omm.com
Party name: Social Science Researchers
 
S. Kyle Duncan Schaerr l Duncan LLP(202) 714-9492; (202) 787-1060
1717 K Street, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC  20006
kduncan@schaerr-duncanpllc.com
Party name: Association of American Physicians and Surgeons, Inc.
 
Agnes Dunogue Shearman & Sterling, LLP(212) 848-4000
599 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY  10022
agnes.dunogue@shearman.com
Party name: Service Women's Action Network and Retired or Former Military Officers
 
Daralyn Jeannine Durie Durie Tancri LLP4153626666
217 Leidesdorff Street
San Francisco, CA  94111
ddurie@durietangri.com
Party name: Law Professors Melissa Murray, et al.
 
John C. Eastman Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence(877) 855-3330
c/o Chapman University School of Law
One University Drive
Orange, CA  92866
jeastman@chapman.edu
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al.
 
Clifton S. Elgarten Crowell & Moring LLC(202) 624-2500
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
celgarten@crowell.com
Party name: Society of Hospital Medicine and Society of OB/Gyn Hospitalists
 
Craig Trively Enoch Enoch Kever PLLC(512)-615-1200
600 Congress Avenue
Suite 2800
Austin, TX  78701
cenoch@enochkever.com
Party name: Bipartisan and Bicameral Coalition of 121 Texas Legislators
 
Alan Ernest P.O. Box 8011(520) 281-7513
Tumacacori, AZ
alanernest@mchsi.com
Party name: The Legal Defense for Unborn Children in support of neither party
 
Lisa Hill Fenning Arnold & Porter LLP(213) 243-4019
44th Floor
777 South Figueroa St.
Los Angeles, CA  90017
lisa.fenning@aporter.com
Party name: Texas Association Against Sexual Assault, et al.
 
Thomas M. Fisher Solicitor General (317) 232-6255
IGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN  46204
Tom.Fisher@atg.in.gov
Party name: Indiana, et al.
 
Steven W. Fitschen The National Legal Foundation(757)-463-6133
2224 Virginia Beach Blvd.
Suite 204
Virginia Beach, VA  23454
nlf@nlf.net
Party name: Democrats for Life, and National Legal Foundation
 
Carrie Y. Flaxman Planned Parenthood Federation of America(202)-973-4830
1110 Vermont Ave., NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC  20005
carrie.flaxman@ppfa.oeg
Party name: Planned Parenthood Federation of America, et al.
 
Justin G. Florence Ropes & Gray LLP(617) 235-4771
Prudential Tower
800 Boylston Street
Boston, MA  02199
justin.florence@ropesgray.com
Party name: Experts in Health Policy
 
Kevin Murray Fong Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP (415) 983-1000
Four Embarcadero Center, 22nd Floor
San Francisco, CA  94111
kevin.fong@pillsburylaw.com
Party name: Historians
 
Catherine M. Foti Morvillo Abramowicz Grand Lason Anello PC(212) 856-9600
New Avenue565 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY  10017
cfoti@maglaw.com
Party name: Republican Majority for Choice, et al.
 
Susan J. Frietsche Senior Staff Attorney(412) 281-2892
Women's Law Project
Western Pennsylvania Office, 401 Wood Street, Suite 1020
Pittsburgh, PA  15222
sfrietsche@womenslawproject.org
Party name: Ten Pennsylvania Abortion Care Providers
 
Eugene Martin Gelernter Paterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP0212-336-2000
1133 Avenue of the Amer.icas
New York, NY  10036
emgelernter@pbwt.com
Party name: Judson Memorial Church, et al.
 
Alan S. Gilbert Denton US LLP(312) 876-8000
233 South Wacker Drive
Suite 5900
Chicago, IL  60606
alan.gilbert@dentons.com
Party name: Business Leaders
 
Stephen G. Gilles Jr. Quinnipiac University School of Law(203) 582-3284
l275 Mount Carmel Ave.
Hamden, CT  06518
stephen.gilles@quinnipiac.edu
Party name: CatholicVote.org Legal Defense Fund, et al.
 
Linda Ceilia Goldstein Dechert LLP212 698-3817
1095 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10036
linda.goldstein@dechert.com
Party name: Honorable Wendy Davis, Teresa Fedor, Lucy Flores, and Judy Nicastro
 
Susan Hays Law Office of Susan Hays PC(214) 557-4819
P.O. Box 41647
Austin, TX  789704
Hayslaw@me.com
Party name: Jane's Due Process, Inc.
 
James L. Hirsen 505 S. Villa Real Drive(714) 283-8880
Suite 208
Anaheim Hills, CA  92807
hirsen@earthlink.net
Party name: Justice and Freedom Fund
 
Lawrence J. Joseph 1250 Connecticut Ave., NW(202) 355-9452
Suite 200
Washington, DC  20036
lj@larryjoseph.com
Party name: Texas Eagle Forum, et al.
 
Kenneth Alan Klukowski
American Civil Rights Union
3213 Duke Street #625
Alexandria, VA  22314
kenklukowski@firstliberty.org
Party name: Concerned Women for America, and Susan B. Anthony List
 
Susan J. Kohlmann Jenner & Block LLP(212) 891-1600
919 third Avenue
37th Floor
New York, NY  10022
skohlmann@jenner.com
Party name: Institute for Women's Policy Research, et al.
 
Adam Lamparello Indiana Tech Law School Amicus Project(260) 422-5561
1600 East Washington Blvd.
Fort Wayne, IN  46803
AXLamparello@indianatech.edu
Party name: Indiana Tech Law School Amicus Project
 
Philip Henry Lebowitz Duane Morris LLP(215) 979-1000
30 South 17th Street
Philadelphia, PA  19103
lebowitz@duane morris.com
Party name: Medical Staff Professionals
 
Janice Marie MacAvoy Fried Frank Harris Shriver & Jacobson LLP(212) 859-8000
0ne New York Plaza
New York, NY  10004
janice.macavoy@friedfrank.com
Party name: National Abortion Federation and Abortion Providers
 
Gillian Elizabeth Metzger Center for Constitutional Governance(212)-854-2667
Colunbia Law School
435 West 116th Street
New York, NY  10027
gillian.metzger@law.columbia.edu
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars Ashutosh Bhagwat, et al.
 
Atara Miller Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy, LLP212-530-5421
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY  10005
amiller@milbank.com
Party name: Freedom and Individual Rights in Medicine (FIRM), et al.
 
Cleta Mitchell 3000 K Street, NW(202) 295-4081
Suite 600
Washington, DC  20007
cmitchell@foley.com
Party name: Texas Values, and 3891 Lancaster Film Project
 
Jonathan F. Mitchell 434 Galvez Mall(650) 723-1397
Room 301 HHMB
Stanford, CA  94305
jfmitche@stanford.edu
Party name: University Faculty for Life and Texas Alliance for Life Trust Fund
 
Robert Joseph Muise American Freedom Law Center(734) 635-3756
P.O. Box 131098
Ann Arbor, MI  48113
rmuise@americanfreedomlawcenter.org
Party name: Priests for Life
 
William J. Olson William J.Olson, P.C.(703) 356-5070
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA  22180-5615
wjo@mindspring.com
Party name: Conservative Legal Defense and Educational Fund, et al.
 
Lynn Mara Paltrow National Advocates for Pregnant Women(212) 255-9252
875 6th Ave., Suite 1807
New York, NY  10001
lmp@advocatesforpregnantwomen.org
Party name: National Advocates for Pregnant Women, et al.
 
Allan E. Parker Jr. The Justice Foundation(210) 614-7157
8023 Vantage Drive
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX  78230
aparker@txjf.org
Party name: 3,348 Women Injured by Abortion, and The Justice Foundation
 
Kimberly A. Parker Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP(202) 663-6000
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20006
kimberly.parker@wilmerhale.com
Party name: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al.
 
Anthony R. Picarello Jr. U.S. Conference of Catholic Bishops(202) 541-3300
3211 Fourth Street, N.E.
Washington, DC  20017
apicarello@usccb.org
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
 
Wesley R. Powell Wilkie Farr & Gallagher LLP(212)-728-8264
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY  10019
wpowell@willkie.com
Party name: Twelve Organizations Dedicated to the Fight for Reproductive Justice
 
Sanford Jay Rosen Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld, LLP(415) 433-6830
50 Fremont Street
Nineteenth Floor
San Francisco, CA  94104-1823
srosen@rbgg.com
Party name: National Center for Lesbian Rights, et al.
 
E. Joshua Rosenkranz Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP(212) 506-5380
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY  10019-6142
jrosenkranz@orrick.com
Party name: Physicians for Reproductive Health
 
D. John Sauer James Otis Law Group LLC(314) 854-1372
231 S. Benniston Ave., Suite 800
St. Louis, MO  63105
jsauer@jamesotis.com
Party name: 24 Scholars of Federalism
 
Andrew L. Schlafly 939 Old Chester Road(908) 719-8608
Far Hills, NJ  07931
aschlafly@aol.com
Party name: Legal Center for Defense of Life
 
Linda Boston Schlueter Trinity Legal Center(210) 697-8202
11120 Wurzbach, Suite 206
San Antonio, TX  78230
TLC4Linda@aol.com
Party name: Former Abortion Providers, et al.
 
Richard W. Schmude P.O. Box 674(281) 376-0277
Tomball, TX  77377-0674
js@schumdelawfirm.com
Party name: Right to Life Advocates, Inc.
 
Jay Alan Sekulow American Center for Law & Justice(202) 546-8890
201 Maryland Ave., N.E.
Washington, DC  20002
sekulow@aclj.org
Party name: American Center for Law & Justice, et al.
 
Shannon Rose Selden Debevoise & Plimpton LLP0212-909-6000
919 3rd Avenue
New York City, NY  10022
srselden@debevoise.com
Party name: American Public Health Association
 
Shannon Rose Selden 919 3rd Avenue 0212-909-6000
New York City, NY  10022
srselden@debevoise.com
Party name: Public Health Deans, Department Chairs, and Faculty and the American Public Health Association
 
Charles S. Sims Proskauer Rose LLP(212) 969-3950
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY  10036
csims@proskauer.com
Party name: Facility Guidelines Institute in support of neither party
 
Mailee R. Smith Americans United for Life(312)-492-7234
655 15th Street, NW
Suite 410
Washington, DC  20005
Mailee.Smith@AUL.org
Party name: More Than 450 Bipartisan and Bicameral State Legislators and Lieutenant Governors
 
Priscilla J. Smith Information Society Project(718) 399-9241
Yale Law School
319 Sterling Place
Brooklyn, NY  11238
priscilla.smith@yale.edu
Party name: Information Society Project at Yale Law School
 
Susan L. Sommer Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.(212) 809-8585
120 Wall Street, 19th Floor
New York, NY  10005
ssommer@lambdalegal.org
Party name: Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
 
Cynthia Soohoo City University of New York School of Law 718-340-4329
2 Court Square
Long lsland City, NY  11101
cynthia.soohoo@law.cuny.edu
Party name: , National Latina Institute for Reproductive Health, et al.
 
Mathew D. Staver Liberty Counsel(800) 671-1776
P.O. Box 540774
Orlando, FL  327854
court@lc.org
Party name: Operation Rescue, and National Hispanic Christian Leadership Conference/CONELA
 
Claude G. Szyfer Stroock & Stroock & Lavan, LLP(212) 806-6000
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY  10038-4982
cszyfer@strook.com
Party name: 163 Members of Congress
 
Edward Tabash 11511 West Olympic Blvd.(310) 279-5120
Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA  90064
etabash@centerforinquiry.net
Party name: Scientists, Science Educators, Skeptics, et al.
 
Morse H. Tan 27 W 156 Fleming Drive(512) 289-5973
Winfield, IL  60115
morsetan@gmail.com
Party name: African American and Hispanic American Organizations
 
Matthew Scott Trokenheim Arent Fox LLP(212) 484-3900
1675 Broadway
New York, NY  10019
matthew.trokenheim@arentfox.com
Party name: National Network of Abortion Funds and 41 Member Abortion Funds
 
Misha Tseytlin Solicitor General of Wisconsin(608) 267-9323
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 W. Main Street
Madison, WI  53703
tseytlinm@doj.state.wi.us
Party name: Wisconsin
 
Barbara D. Underwood Solicitor General(212) 416-8020
Office of the Attorney General
120 Broadway, 25th Floor
New York, NY  10271-0332
barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
Party name: New York, et al.
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
 
Randall L. Wenger Independence Law Center(717) 657-4990
23 North Front Street
Second Floor
Harrisburg, PA  17101
Party name: CitizenLink, et al.
 
Christopher J. Wright Harris Wiltshire & Grannis LLP(202) 730-1300
1919 M Street NW
Eighth Floor
Washington, DC  20036
cwright@hwglaw.com
Party name: Advocates for Youth
 
Elizabeth B. Wydra Constitutional Accountability Center(202) 296-6889
1200 18th St., N.W., Suite 501
Washington, DC  20036
elizabeth@theusconstitution.org
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
 
Robert Michael Yablon University of Wisconsin Law School(608) 262-2240
975 Bascom Mall
Madison, WI  53706
robert.yablon@wisc.edu
Party name: Professors Michael Dorf, Helen Hershkoff, Gillian Metzger, Neil Siegel, and David Strauss
September 21, 2016 | Version 2014.2