Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 15-260
No. 15-260
Title:
Anh Nguyet Tran, et al., Petitioners
v.
Bank of New York, nka Bank of New York Mellon, et al.
Docketed:September 2, 2015
Linked with 14A1287
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-1224-cv)
  Decision Date:January 30, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:April 3, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 22 2015 Application (14A1287) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 2, 2015 to August 31, 2015, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Jun 23 2015 Application (14A1287) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until August 31, 2015.
Aug 31 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 2, 2015)
Sep 24 2015 Waiver of right of respondents U.S. Bank National Association, et al. to respond filed.
Sep 30 2015 Waiver of right of respondent Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Solely in its Capacity as Trustee to respond filed.
Oct 14 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2015.
Nov 2 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Erik S. Jaffe Erik S. Jaffe, P.C.(202) 237-8165
    Counsel of Record5101 34th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20008
jaffe@esjpc.com
Party name: Anh Nguyet Tran, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Bernard J. Garbutt III. Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP (212) 309-6000
    Counsel of Record101 Park Avenue
New York, NY  10178
bgarbutt@morganlewis.com
Party name: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Solely in its Capacity as Trustee
 
Eric R. Sherman Dorsey & Whitney, LLP(612) 340-2600
    Counsel of Record50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500
Minneapolis, MN  55402
sherman.eric@dorsey.com
Party name: U.S. Bank National Association, et al.
May 27, 2017 | Version 2014.2