Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 15-196
No. 15-196
Title:
Electronic Privacy Information Center, Petitioner
v.
Department of Homeland Security
Docketed:August 13, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-5013)
  Decision Date:February 10, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:May 13, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 11 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 14, 2015)
Sep 11 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 14, 2015.
Oct 14 2015 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2015.
Nov 13 2015 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 27, 2015.
Nov 27 2015 Brief of respondent Department of Homeland Security in opposition filed.
Dec 11 2015 Reply of petitioner Electronic Privacy Information Center filed.
Dec 15 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Marc Rotenberg Electronic Privacy Information Center(202) 483-1140
    Counsel of Record1718 Connecticut Ave., N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC  20009
rotenberg@epic.org
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Department of Homeland Security
March 29, 2017 | Version 2014.2